EP3727474 - RADIOLABELING OF POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Biotech, Inc. 800/850 Ridgeview Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUDKIN, Vadim 1400 McKean Road Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 02 /
GOLDBERG, Shalom 1400 McKean Road Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 03 /
ERHARDT, Joseph 1400 McKean Road Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 04 /
SALTER, Rhys 1400 McKean Road Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 05 /
MCDEVITT, Theresa, M. 1400 McKean Road, 41-2140 Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Duffield, Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18830649.2 | 17.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US65913 | Priority number, date | US201762599830P | 18.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762599830 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019125982 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3727474 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/10 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
A61K51/1096 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07B59/008 (US);
A61K51/1072 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/3069 (US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | RADIOAKTIVE MARKIERUNG VON POLYPEPTIDEN | [2020/44] | English: | RADIOLABELING OF POLYPEPTIDES | [2020/44] | French: | RADIOMARQUAGE DE POLYPEPTIDES | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 17.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2015176056 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XY] - LAVERMAN P ET AL, "In-depth evaluation of the cycloaddition-retro-Diels-Alder reaction for in vivo targeting with [<111>In]-DTPA-RGD conjugates", NUCLEAR MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, NY, US, vol. 36, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.NUCMEDBIO.2009.05.001, ISSN 0969-8051, (20091001), pages 749 - 757, (20090709), XP026545226 [X] 1,5 * figure 1 * [Y] 2-4,6-32 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nucmedbio.2009.05.001 | [Y] - NIKKI A. THIELE ET AL, "An Eighteen-Membered Macrocyclic Ligand for Actinium-225 Targeted Alpha Therapy", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, DE, (20171016), vol. 56, no. 46, doi:10.1002/anie.201709532, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 14712 - 14717, XP055543785 [Y] 2-4,6-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201709532 | [AD] - W. F. MAGUIRE ET AL, "Efficient 1-Step Radiolabeling of Monoclonal Antibodies to High Specific Activity with 225Ac for -Particle Radioimmunotherapy of Cancer", THE JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, US, (20140630), vol. 55, no. 9, doi:10.2967/jnumed.114.138347, ISSN 0161-5505, pages 1492 - 1498, XP055568060 [AD] 1-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2967/jnumed.114.138347 | by applicant | US2013266512 | WO2015073746 | - KIM, Y.S.; M.W. BRECHBIEL, "An overview of targeted alpha therapy", Tumour Biol, (20120000), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 573 - 90 | - MIEDERER et al., "Realizing the potential of the Actinium-225 radionuclide generator in targeted alpha particle therapy applications", Adv DrugDeliv Rev, (20080000), vol. 60, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.addr.2008.04.009, pages 71 - 82, XP022851265 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2008.04.009 | - KWEKKEBOOM DJ et al., "177Lu-DOTAOTyr3]octreotate: comparison with [11 1In-DTPAo]octreotide in patients", Eur JNucl Med., (20010000), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1007/s002590100574, pages 1319 - 1325, XP001088577 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002590100574 | - DEAL, K.A. et al., "Improved in vivo stability of actinium-225 macrocyclic complexes", J Med Chem, (19990000), vol. 42, no. 15, doi:doi:10.1021/jm990141f, pages 2988 - 92, XP002145740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm990141f | - MCDEVITT, M.R. et al., "Tumor therapy with targeted atomic nanogenerators", Science, (20010000), vol. 294, no. 5546, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1064126, pages 1537 - 40, XP001088572 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1064126 | - MAGUIRE, W.F. et al., "Efficient 1-step radiolabeling of monoclonal antibodies to high specific activity with 225Ac for alpha-particle radioimmunotherapy of cancer", J Nucl Med, (20140000), vol. 55, no. 9, pages 1492 - 8 | - KOLB, FINN; SHARPLESS, Angewandte Chemie International Edition, (20010000), vol. 40, pages 2004 - 2021 | - EVANS, Australian Journal of Chemistry, (20070000), vol. 60, pages 384 - 395 | - DEBETS, M.F. et al., "Bioconjugation with strained alkenes and alkynes", Acc Chem Res, (20110000), vol. 44, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1021/ar200059z, pages 805 - 15, XP002720881 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ar200059z | - AGARWAL, P.; C.R. BERTOZZI, "Site-specific antibody-drug conjugates: the nexus of bioorthogonal chemistry, protein engineering, and drug development", Bioconjug Chem, (20150000), vol. 26, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1021/bc5004982, pages 176 - 92, XP055207867 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc5004982 | - LI, X. et al., "Preparation of well-defined antibody-drug conjugates through glycan remodeling and strain-promoted azide-alkyne cycloadditions", Angew Chem Int Ed Engl, (20140000), vol. 53, no. 28, doi:doi:10.1002/anie.201402606, pages 7179 - 82, XP055241195 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201402606 | - XIAO, H. et al., "Genetic incorporation of multiple unnatural amino acids into proteins in mammalian cells", Angew Chem Int Ed Engl, (20130000), vol. 52, no. 52, doi:doi:10.1002/anie.201308137, pages 14080 - 3, XP055122417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201308137 | - SPICER et al., "Selective chemical protein modification", Nature Communications, (20140000), vol. 5, page 4740 | - THIELE et al., "An Eighteen-Membered Macrocyclic Ligand for Actinium-225 Targeted Alpha Therapy", Angew Chem Int Ed Engl., (20171113), vol. 56, no. 46, doi:doi:10.1002/anie.201709532, pages 14712 - 14717, XP055543785 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201709532 | - KRAEBER-BODERE, F. et al., "A pretargeting system for tumor PET imaging and radioimmunotherapy", Front Pharmacol, (20150000), vol. 6, page 54 | - DENNLER et al., "Transglutaminase-based chemo-enzymatic conjugation approach yields homogeneous antibody-drug conjugates", Bioconj Chem, (20140319), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1021/bc400574z, pages 569 - 78, XP055118351 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc400574z | - BERNHARD et al., Chem. Eur. J., (20120000), vol. 18, pages 7834 - 7841 | - PANDYA et al., "Zirconium tetraazamacrocycle complexes display extraordinary stability and provide a new strategy for zirconium-89-based radiopharmaceutical development", Chem Sci, (20170301), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 2309 - 2314 |