EP3723521 - COMPACTING UNIT FOR THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/43] | COMPACTING UNIT AND METHOD FOR THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY | ||
[2021/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D S.p.A. Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAMBERINI, Giuliano Via Panerazzi, 151 40014 Crevalcore (Bologna) / IT | 02 /
ESPOSTI, Marco Via Michelangelo 3 40033 Casalecchio Di Reno (Bologna) / IT | 03 /
SARTONI, Massimo Via Leandro Alberti, 79 40139 Bologna / IT | 04 /
FEDERICI, Luca Via Lippo di Dalmasio, 13 40135 Bologna / IT | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Bianciardi, Ezio Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18830950.4 | 10.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018IB59825 | Priority number, date | IT20170143643 | 13.12.2017 Original published format: IT201700143643 | [2020/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019116196 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3723521 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3723521 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/47 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
A24C5/471 (EP);
A24C5/327 (US);
A24C5/478 (EP,US);
A24D3/0241 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDICHTUNGSEINHEIT FÜR DIE TABAKINDUSTRIE | [2021/23] | English: | COMPACTING UNIT FOR THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY | [2021/23] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMPACTAGE POUR L'INDUSTRIE DU TABAC | [2021/23] |
Former [2020/43] | VERDICHTUNGSEINHEIT UND -VERFAHREN FÜR DIE TABAKINDUSTRIE | ||
Former [2020/43] | COMPACTING UNIT AND METHOD FOR THE TOBACCO INDUSTRY | ||
Former [2020/43] | UNITÉ DE COMPACTAGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'INDUSTRIE DU TABAC | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 19.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2018 | AL | 17.11.2021 | AT | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | CZ | 17.11.2021 | DK | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | ES | 17.11.2021 | FI | 17.11.2021 | HR | 17.11.2021 | IT | 17.11.2021 | LT | 17.11.2021 | LV | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | MK | 17.11.2021 | MT | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | RS | 17.11.2021 | SE | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SK | 17.11.2021 | SM | 17.11.2021 | TR | 17.11.2021 | IE | 10.12.2021 | LU | 10.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | BG | 17.02.2022 | NO | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | IS | 17.03.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 10.12.2018 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
TR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.12.2021 | ||
LU | 10.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 10.12.2018 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.12.2021 | ||
LU | 10.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 10.12.2018 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.12.2021 | ||
LU | 10.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.12.2021 | ||
LU | 10.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.12.2021 | ||
LU | 10.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.12.2021 | ||
LU | 10.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.12.2021 | ||
LU | 10.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.12.2021 | ||
LU | 10.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 10.12.2021 | ||
LU | 10.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 10.12.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2821201 (GEB SCHMALFELDT IRMA BRUNSWIG, et al) [Y] 5,6,8 * column 2, line 12 - line 23 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 8; figure -; claim - *; | [XYI]GB902448 (TABAK & IND MASCH) [X] 1,2,10 * page 1, line 70 - line 83; figure - * * page 2, line 7 - line 47 * [Y] 5,6,8 [I] 3,4,7,9,11,12; | [A]WO2005046366 (GD SPA [IT], et al) [A] 7,8* column 8, line 4 - column 9, line 7; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP2965639 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0046]; figure -; claim - * |