EP3654458 - CABLE CONNECTOR HAVING CRIMP STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirose Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5-23 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8587 / JP | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGANUMA Kenichi c/o HIROSE ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 5-5-23 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8587 / JP | 02 /
SAKAIZAWA Tadashi c/o HIROSE ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 5-5-23 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8587 / JP | 03 /
SAKODA Yusuke c/o HIROSE ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 5-5-23 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8587 / JP | 04 /
CHAMURA Shingo c/o HIROSE ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 5-5-23 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8587 / JP | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18831522.0 | 25.05.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018JP20108 | Priority number, date | JP20170135891 | 12.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017135891 | [2020/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019012816 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654458 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/6581, H01R4/18, H01R13/6593 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
H01R13/6593 (EP);
H01R13/6581 (EP,US);
H01R4/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | H01R13/6581, H01R4/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | KABELVERBINDER MIT CRIMPSTRUKTUR | [2020/21] | English: | CABLE CONNECTOR HAVING CRIMP STRUCTURE | [2020/21] | French: | CONNECTEUR DE CÂBLE AYANT UNE STRUCTURE DE SERTISSAGE | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2020 | Translation filed | 10.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 05.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YA]JPH01315968 (HIROSE ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 5-7, 11 * , fig. 1 & US 4917629 A (fig. 1) * [A] 9; | [A]JP2502459Y (SDK KK) [A] 1-11* , paragraph [0003], fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP3354269B (THE WHITAKER CORPORATION) [X] 1-3, 8 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0024], fig. 1-7 & US 5518421 A (column 4, line 1 to column 5, line 21, fig. 1-7) & EP 608813 A2 & DE 69417780 T & KR 10-0212589 B1 * [Y] 4-7, 10-11 [A] 9; | [YA]JP2010176960 (FUJIKURA LTD) [Y] 4-7, 10-11 * , fig. 1-3 (Family: none) * [A] 9 | by applicant | JP2010176960 |