Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10794754 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2020 | B2 | US2020033183 | 30.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017137122 | 13.07.2017 | WO2018JP23503 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102264777B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2021 | B1 | KR20190115056 | 10.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017137122 | 13.07.2017 | WO2018JP23503 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110462138B | Global Dossier | 10.12.2021 | B | CN110462138 | 15.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017137122 | 13.07.2017 | WO2018JP23503 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018300872B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2020 | B2 | AU2018300872 | 03.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017137122 | 13.07.2017 | WO2018JP23503 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3653797 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2024 | B1 | EP3653797 | 07.04.2021 | A4 | EP3653797 | 20.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017137122 | 13.07.2017 | WO2018JP23503 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019012933 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017137122 | 13.07.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6704375B | Global Dossier | 03.06.2020 | B2 | JP2019019496 | 07.02.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017137122 | 13.07.2017 |