EP3651583 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING THE CONSISTENCY OF ESPRESSO SHOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NuBru, LLC 621 SE 168th Avenue, Apartment 34 Vancouver, WA 98684-9628 / US | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUVE, Ronald, A. 4220 201 st Ave. NE Sammamish, WA 98074 / US | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Consulenza in Proprietà Industriale Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 18831631.9 | 11.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018US41693 | Priority number, date | US201762531120P | 11.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762531120 P | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019014381 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3651583 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/26, A47J31/52, A47J31/46, A47J31/00 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
A47J31/5255 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/002 (EP,KR,US);
A23F5/262 (EP);
A47J31/467 (KR,US);
A47J31/469 (EP,KR);
A47J31/5251 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/5253 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | A23F5/26, A47J31/36, A47J31/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER KONSISTENZ VON ESPRESSO-SHOTS | [2020/21] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING THE CONSISTENCY OF ESPRESSO SHOTS | [2020/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'AMÉLIORER L'UNIFORMITÉ DES TIRAGES D'ESPRESSO | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 03.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP20156611.4 / EP3685672 | EP21000083.2 / EP3874962 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013068012 (PRESTON ADAM [AU], et al); | [XI]US2014137746 (MORAN SEAN MARTIN [IE], et al); | [XI]US2015110935 (PREFONTAINE JASON CAMILLE [US]); | [XI]US2016249761 (LLOPIS FRANCESCO DANIELE [IT]); | [XI]WO2017068021 (LA MARZOCCO SRL [IT]) | International search | [A]US2013068012 (PRESTON ADAM [AU], et al); | [A]US2014123857 (REGO FRANCISCO ALFREDO [US]); | [A]US2014137746 (MORAN SEAN MARTIN [IE], et al); | [A]US9364117 (PREFONTAINE JASON CAMILLE [US]); | [XA]US2016287007 (BARNETT MARK [US], et al) |