EP3651699 - BONE FIXATION SYSTEM, ASSEMBLY, IMPLANTS, DEVICES, INSERTION GUIDES, AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paragon 28, Inc. 14445 Grasslands Drive Englewood, CO 80112 / US | [2020/29] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Paragon 28, Inc. 4B Inverness Court E. Suite 280 Englewood, Colorado 80112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DACOSTA, Albert c/o Paragon 28 Inc. 4B Inverness Court E. Suite 280 Englewood, Colorado 80112 / US | 02 /
HUTCHINSON, Byron L. 229 S. 173rd Place Seattle, Washington 98148 / US | 03 /
RAYMOND, Spanky 2513 Greenview Drive Uniontown, Ohio 44685 / US | 04 /
LEE, Dan J. c/o Paragon 28 Inc. 4B Inverness Court E. Suite 280 Englewood, Colorado 80112 / US | 05 /
BARMES, Frank c/o Paragon 28 Inc. 4B Inverness Court E. Suite 280 Englewood, Colorado 80112 / US | 06 /
BRINKER, Laura Zagrocki c/o Paragon 28 Inc. 4B Inverness Court E. Suite 280 Englewood, Colorado 80112 / US | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18831633.5 | 11.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018US41657 | Priority number, date | US201762530909P | 11.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762530909 P | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019014356 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3651699 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/42, A61F2/46, A61F5/00, A61B17/56, A61B17/17, A61B17/16, A61B17/80, A61B17/72 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
A61B17/8061 (EP,US);
A61B17/1775 (EP,US);
A61B17/1682 (EP,US);
A61B17/1728 (EP,US);
A61B17/8057 (EP,US);
A61B17/808 (US);
A61B2017/564 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | KNOCHENFIXATIONSSYSTEM, ANORDNUNG, IMPLANTATE, VORRICHTUNGEN, EINSETZFÜHRUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2020/21] | English: | BONE FIXATION SYSTEM, ASSEMBLY, IMPLANTS, DEVICES, INSERTION GUIDES, AND METHODS OF USE | [2020/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FIXATION OSSEUSE, ENSEMBLE, IMPLANTS, DISPOSITIFS, GUIDES D'INSERTION ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 04.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0617927 (GOTFRIED YEHIEL [IL]); | [XY]US2007173843 (MATITYAHU AMIR M [US]); | [YA]US2011046681 (PRANDI BERNARD [FR], et al); | [YA]EP3023068 (PARAGON 28 INC [US]) | International search | [YA]US7316687 (AIKINS JERRY L [US], et al) [Y] 2, 50, 51/(50) * entire document, especially Fig. 12,13,21,23,24; col 1, In 36-5 * [A] 13-19; | [A]US2009036931 (PECH UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1-51, 68-75, 78-80 * entire document *; | [A]US2009088767 (LEYDEN MATTHEW V [US], et al) [A] 1-51 , 68-75, 78-80 * entire document *; | [A]US2009093849 (GRABOWSKI GREG [US]) [A] 1-51 , 68-75, 78-80 * entire document *; | [A]WO2009052294 (EBI LLC [US], et al) [A] 2-3, 50-51/(49,50) * , entire document, especially Figs. 11-13; para [0103],[0120] *; | [XYA]US2011270319 (SHEFFER GARRETT A [US]) [X] 1, 3-5, 49, 51/(49) * entire document, especially Figs.18, 19, 21, 23, 27C; para [0050], [0058], [0062], [0095], [0121], [0144] * [Y] 2, 6-12, 50, 51/(50) [A] 13-19; | [XY]US2013172942 (LEWIS DEREK S [US], et al) [X] 35-41, 71-75 * entire document, especially (Fig. 11, 12, 33(a)-(b); para [0053] * [Y] 6-12; | [A]US8535355 (PRASAD PRIYA [US], et al) [A] 1-51 , 68-75, 78-80* entire document *; | [X]US2014066996 (PRICE JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 32-34, 68-70 * entire document, especially Fig. 16, 20; para [0038] *; | [A]WO2015138542 (SHOULDER OPTIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-51 , 68-75, 78-80 * , entire document *; | [X]US2015359580 (DACOSTA ALBERT [US], et al) [X] 42-48, 78-80 * entire document, especially Figs. 20-22; para [0055] *; | [YA]US2017056031 (AWTREY GEORGE MATTHEW [US], et al) [Y] 20-22 * entire document, especially Fig. 5; para [0005]-[0006], [0036]-0038], [0048], [0057], [0063] * [A] 23-31; | [YA] - BUDNY et al., "Naviculocuneiform Arthrodesis", Clinics in Podiatric Medicine and Surgery, (20071000), vol. 24, no. 4, pages 753 - 763, XP055659794 [Y] 20-22 * , para 1, pg 757, para 1, pg 758 * [A] 23-31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cpm.2007.06.001 | [A] - Thati et al., "Laparoscopic extraction of fractured Kirschner wire from the pelvis", Journal of Minimal Access Surgery, (20140600), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 97 - 98, XP055576247 [A] 1-51, 68-75, 78-80 * entire document, especially abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4103/0972-9941.129967 | by applicant | EP0617927 | US2007173843 | US2011046681 | US2011270319 | US2014066996 | EP3023068 |