EP3616760 - RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TENNIS BALL, AND TENNIS BALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HYODO, Takehiko c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES. LTD. 6-9. Wakinohama-cho 3-Chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 02 /
TAGUCHI, Masanori c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES. LTD. 6-9. Wakinohama-cho 3-Chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 03 /
SHIGA, Kazuyoshi c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES. LTD. 6-9. Wakinohama-cho 3-Chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Hiroaki c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES. LTD. 6-9. Wakinohama-cho 3-Chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 05 /
NIWA, Kunio c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES. LTD. 6-9. Wakinohama-cho 3-Chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 06 /
SUZUKI, Fumiya c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES. LTD. 6-9. Wakinohama-cho 3-Chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18831678.0 | 29.06.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018JP24836 | Priority number, date | JP20170137741 | 14.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017137741 | JP20170137743 | 14.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017137743 | [2020/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019013019 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3616760 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63B39/00, C08K3/00, C08L7/00, C08L21/00, C08K3/34 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
A63B39/00 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/00 (EP);
C08K3/04 (US);
C08K3/042 (US);
C08K3/34 (US);
C08K3/36 (US);
A63B2039/006 (EP,US);
C08K2201/003 (US);
C08L2207/53 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08K5/09, C08K3/22, C08K3/36, C08K3/04, C08K3/346, C08K3/06, C08K5/31, C08K5/47, C08K5/47 (EP);
C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08K5/09, C08K3/22, C08K3/36, C08K3/04, C08K3/34, C08K3/06, C08K5/31, C08K5/47, C08K5/47 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/10] | A63B39/00, C08K3/00, C08L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | GUMMIZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR TENNISBALL UND TENNISBALL | [2020/10] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION FOR TENNIS BALL, AND TENNIS BALL | [2020/10] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC POUR BALLE DE TENNIS, ET BALLE DE TENNIS | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2019 | Translation filed | 28.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 29.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61162965 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2005029769 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 8,9* the whole document *; | [X]WO2010034587 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * examples E1-E3; table 1 *; | [X]JP2012012513 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * comparative example 3 *; | [X]JP2013067707 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-7 * examples 18-19 * | International search | [Y]JPS61143455 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , *; | [A]US5593157 (KOROS WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-9* , *; | [Y]JP2002504174 [Y] 1-9 * , *; | [Y]JP2008189885 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 1-9 * , * | by applicant | JPS61143455 |