EP3652637 - MULTI-PROCESS ACCESS TO A SINGLE-PROCESS RESOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Realwear, Incorporated 600 Hatheway Road, Suite 105 Vancouver, WA 98661 / US | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKINSON, Christopher Iain 2006 Harris Avenue Richland Washington 99354 / US | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Valvoda, Jakob Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18831828.1 | 06.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018US41091 | Priority number, date | US201715650602 | 14.07.2017 Original published format: US201715650602 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019014065 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652637 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16, G06F9/22, G06F9/50, G06F9/54, G02B27/01, H04N7/14, H04N7/18 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
G06F3/162 (EP);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (US);
G06F3/012 (US);
G06F3/165 (EP);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (US);
G02B2027/014 (EP);
G02B2027/0187 (US);
G02B27/0093 (US);
G09G5/36 (US);
H04N7/142 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | G06F9/22, G06F9/50, G06F9/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | MEHRFACHPROZESSZUGANG ZU EINER EINZELPROZESSRESSOURCE | [2020/21] | English: | MULTI-PROCESS ACCESS TO A SINGLE-PROCESS RESOURCE | [2020/21] | French: | ACCÈS MULTI-PROCESSUS À UNE RESSOURCE DE TRAITEMENT UNIQUE | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 27.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.03.2024 | 20.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/32] | 04.04.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006050155 (ING STEPHEN S [US], et al); | [I]US2010231754 (WANG SHAOLAN [CN], et al); | [I]US2016004575 (FINK RYAN [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US6747611 (BUDD RUSSELL A [US], et al) [Y] 17, 18* ; abstract *; | [Y]US2011314185 (CONROY DAVID G [US], et al) [Y] 1-6, 9, 10, 12-19 * ; figure 3; paragraphs [0030], [0036], [0045], [0047] *; | [Y]EP3062260 (SAP SE [DE]) [Y] 1-6, 9, 10, 12-19 * ; paragraphs [0004], [0017], [0024]; claims 1, 2 *; | [YA]US2017084280 (SRINIVASAN SRIRAM [US], et al) [Y] 6 * ; paragraphs [0014], [0018] * [A] 7, 8, 11, 20 | by applicant | US2006050155 | US2010231754 | US2016004575 |