EP3652175 - MECHANICALLY INTERLOCKED AIR-STABLE RADICALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northwestern University 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Northwestern University 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Zhichang School of Science Westlake University 18 Shilongshan Road Hangzhou 310024 Zhejiang / CN | 02 /
SUN, Junling 40 Empire Drive Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 03 /
STODDART, James, Fraser 2720 Noyes Sreet Evanston, IL 60201 / US | [2020/37] |
Former [2020/21] | 01 /
LIU, Zhichang 822 Noyes Street Apt. 2K Evanston, IL 60201 / US | ||
02 /
SUN, Junling 40 Empire Drive Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | |||
03 /
STODDART, James, Fraser 2720 Noyes Sreet Evanston, IL 60201 / US | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 18832673.0 | 11.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018US41551 | Priority number, date | US201762531115P | 11.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762531115 P | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019014296 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652175 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/06, C30B29/54, C07D401/14, C30B7/00 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP,US);
H01B1/122 (US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/06 (EP,US);
C30B29/54 (EP,US);
C30B7/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | C07D471/22, A61K31/4425, C30B29/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Title | German: | MECHANISCH VERRIEGELTE LUFTSTABILE RADIKALE | [2020/21] | English: | MECHANICALLY INTERLOCKED AIR-STABLE RADICALS | [2020/21] | French: | RADICAUX STABLES À L'AIR MÉCANIQUEMENT IMBRIQUÉS | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 23.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 13.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2015191470 (FAHRENBACH ALBERT C [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * page 13, paragraph 101; figure 14; claim -; compound C4 *; | [Y]WO2009149381 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * formula XVII, XIX; paragraphs [0063] , [0078]; claim - *; | [Y] - BALZANI VINCENZO ET AL, "Constructing Molecular Machinery: A Chemically-Switchable [2]Catenane", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 122, no. 14, doi:10.1021/ja994454b, ISSN 0002-7863, (20000401), pages 3542 - 3543, URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/ja994454b, XP055774722 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja994454b | International search | [Y]US2015191470 (FAHRENBACH ALBERT C [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 13-15, 17-19 * para [0032], [0038], Fig 14, scheme; para [0094] *; | [Y]US8946454 (YAGHI OMAR M [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 13-15, 17-19 * col 23, In 5-15; col 43, In 1-10; In 61-65 *; | [A]US2014179017 (STODDART J FRASER [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 13-15, 17-19 * Entire Document * | [A] - FANG et al., "Syntheses and dynamics of donor-acceptor [2]catenanes in water", Journal of the American chemical society, (20110000), vol. 133, no. 3, pages 396 - 399, XP055564008 [A] 1-5, 13-15, 17-19 * Entire Document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja1087562 |