EP3724081 - PLANT AND PROCESS FOR VACUUM PACKAGING PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, LLC 2415 Cascade Pointe Blvd. Charlotte, NC 28208 / US | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALUMBO, Riccardo Via Pertossi 12 28041 Arona (NO) / IT | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18833522.8 | 11.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018IB59880 | Priority number, date | IT20170143911 | 13.12.2017 Original published format: IT201700143911 | [2020/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019116227 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724081 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3724081 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/52, B65B31/02, B65B31/04 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
B65B31/042 (EP,KR);
B65B11/52 (EP,KR,US);
B65B31/028 (EP,KR,US);
B65B57/00 (KR);
B65B7/164 (US);
B65D75/305 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR VAKUUMVERPACKUNGSPRODUKTE | [2021/32] | English: | PLANT AND PROCESS FOR VACUUM PACKAGING PRODUCTS | [2020/43] | French: | INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DES PRODUITS D'EMBALLAGE SOUS VIDE | [2021/32] |
Former [2020/43] | ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM VAKUUMVERPACKEN VON PRODUKTEN | ||
Former [2020/43] | INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'EMBALLAGE SOUS VIDE DE PRODUITS | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 02.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2018 | AL | 10.11.2021 | AT | 10.11.2021 | CY | 10.11.2021 | CZ | 10.11.2021 | DK | 10.11.2021 | EE | 10.11.2021 | FI | 10.11.2021 | HR | 10.11.2021 | IT | 10.11.2021 | LT | 10.11.2021 | LV | 10.11.2021 | MC | 10.11.2021 | MK | 10.11.2021 | MT | 10.11.2021 | NL | 10.11.2021 | PL | 10.11.2021 | RO | 10.11.2021 | RS | 10.11.2021 | SE | 10.11.2021 | SI | 10.11.2021 | SK | 10.11.2021 | SM | 10.11.2021 | IE | 11.12.2021 | LU | 11.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | CH | 31.12.2021 | LI | 31.12.2021 | BG | 10.02.2022 | NO | 10.02.2022 | GR | 11.02.2022 | IS | 10.03.2022 | PT | 10.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 11.12.2018 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 11.12.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 11.12.2018 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 11.12.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 11.12.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 11.12.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 11.12.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
CH | 31.12.2021 | ||
LI | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 11.12.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 11.12.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 11.12.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
LU | 11.12.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 10.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP2905233 (CRYOVAC INC [US]) [X] 1,18 * the whole document * [A] 2-17,19,20; | [XA]EP2907759 (CRYOVAC INC [US]) [X] 1,18 * the whole document *[A] 2-17,19,20; | [XA]WO2017149073 (CRYOVAC INC [US], et al) [X] 1,18 * the whole document * [A] 2-17,19,20 |