EP3717940 - SEISMIC THREE-DIMENSIONAL MEASUREMENT METHOD FOR SMALL OBJECTS, SUBMARINE CABLES AND THE LIKE IN THE SEA BED AS WELL AS SYSTEM OF SEA SWELL INDEPENDENT TOWED BODY AND MODULAR DEVICE CARRIER FOR THE ULTRA-HIGH RESOLUTION 3D MEASUREMENT OF SMALL STRUCTURES IN THE SEA BED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/41] | SEISMIC THREE-DIMENSIONAL MEASUREMENT METHOD FOR SMALL OBJECTS, SUBMARINE CABLES AND THE LIKE IN THE SEA BED, SEA SWELL INDEPENDENT TOWED BODY FOR THE ULTRA-HIGH RESOLUTION 3D MEASUREMENT OF SMALL STRUCTURES IN THE SEA BED AND MODULAR DEVICE CARRIER FOR THE THREE-DIMENSIONAL MEASUREMENT OF SMALL OBJECTS IN THE SEA BED | ||
[2024/26] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geomar Helmholtz-Zentrum für Ozeanforschung Kiel Wischhofstrasse 1-3 24148 Kiel / DE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIALAS, Jörg Langer Rehm 21 24226 Heikendorf / DE | 02 /
BERNDT, Christian Schillerstr. 12 24116 Kiel / DE | 03 /
VOLZ, Martin Wacholderstraße 24 24229 Schwedeneck / DE | 04 /
EISENBERG-KLEIN, Gerald Weidkämpe 25 30659 Hannover / DE | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Puschmann Borchert Kaiser Klettner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bajuwarenring 21 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | Shalibeik, Hotan Heeschen Patentanwaltskanzlei SHpatent Stadtweg 7-9 21684 Stade / DE | Application number, filing date | 18833598.8 | 26.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018DE100959 | Priority number, date | DE201710128159 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017128159 | DE201710128161 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017128161 | DE201710128160 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017128160 | [2020/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019105510 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3717940 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/38 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
G01V1/3843 (EP);
G01V1/3808 (EP);
G01V1/3817 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Title | German: | SEISMISCHES DREIDIMENSIONALES VERMESSUNGSVERFAHREN KLEINER OBJEKTE, SEEKABEL UND DERGLEICHEN IM MEERESBODEN SOWIE SYSTEM AUS SEEGANGSUNABHÄNGIGEM SCHLEPPKÖRPER UND MODULAREM GERÄTETRÄGER FÜR DIE ULTRA-HOCHAUFLÖSENDE 3D VERMESSUNG KLEINER STRUKTUREN IM MEERESBODEN | [2024/26] | English: | SEISMIC THREE-DIMENSIONAL MEASUREMENT METHOD FOR SMALL OBJECTS, SUBMARINE CABLES AND THE LIKE IN THE SEA BED AS WELL AS SYSTEM OF SEA SWELL INDEPENDENT TOWED BODY AND MODULAR DEVICE CARRIER FOR THE ULTRA-HIGH RESOLUTION 3D MEASUREMENT OF SMALL STRUCTURES IN THE SEA BED | [2024/26] | French: | EPROCÉDÉ DE REPÉRAGE TRIDIMENSIONNEL SISMIQUE DE PETITS OBJETS, DE CÂBLES SOUS-MARINS ET ANALOGUES SUR LES FONDS MARINS, ET SYSTEME DE CORPS REMORQUÉ INDÉPENDANT DE LA HOULE ET SUPPORT D'APPAREIL MODULAIRE POUR REPÉRER EN 3D ULTRA-HAUTE DÉFINITION DE PETITES STRUCTURES SUR LES FONDS MARINS | [2024/26] |
Former [2020/41] | SEISMISCHES DREIDIMENSIONALES VERMESSUNGSVERFAHREN KLEINER OBJEKTE, SEEKABEL UND DERGLEICHEN IM MEERESBODEN, SEEGANGSUNABHÄNGIGER SCHLEPPKÖRPER FÜR DIE ULTRA-HOCHAUFLÖSENDE 3D VERMESSUNG KLEINER STRUKTUREN IM MEERESBODEN SOWIE MODULARER GERÄTETRÄGER ZUR DREIDIMENSIONALEN VERMESSUNG KLEINER OBJEKTE IM MEERESBODEN | ||
Former [2020/41] | SEISMIC THREE-DIMENSIONAL MEASUREMENT METHOD FOR SMALL OBJECTS, SUBMARINE CABLES AND THE LIKE IN THE SEA BED, SEA SWELL INDEPENDENT TOWED BODY FOR THE ULTRA-HIGH RESOLUTION 3D MEASUREMENT OF SMALL STRUCTURES IN THE SEA BED AND MODULAR DEVICE CARRIER FOR THE THREE-DIMENSIONAL MEASUREMENT OF SMALL OBJECTS IN THE SEA BED | ||
Former [2020/41] | PROCÉDÉ DE REPÉRAGE TRIDIMENSIONNEL SISMIQUE DE PETITS OBJETS, DE CÂBLES SOUS-MARINS ET ANALOGUES SUR LES FONDS MARINS, CORPS REMORQUÉ INDÉPENDANT DE LA HOULE POUR REPÉRER EN 3D ULTRA-HAUTE DÉFINITION DE PETITES STRUCTURES SUR LES FONDS MARINS ET SUPPORT D'APPAREIL MODULAIRE POUR LE REPÉRAGE TRIDIMENSIONNEL DE PETITS OBJETS SUR LES FONDS MARINS | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 22.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4924449 (GUIGNE JACQUES Y [CA]) [I] 1-11 * column 1, lines 43-59 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 19 * * column 3, lines 53-56 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 6 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2005180260 (PLANKE SVERRE [NO], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] - [0 33] - [0037]; figures 1-2 *; | [DA]US2013258811 (GUIGNE JACQUES Y [CA], et al) [DA] 1-11* paragraphs [0033] - [0039] - [0 41] - [0045]; figure 1 * |