Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3717940 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017128160 | 28.11.2017 | DE102017128159 | 28.11.2017 | WO2018DE100959 | 26.11.2018 | DE102017128161 | 28.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102017128159 | 29.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017128159 | 28.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102017128160 | 29.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017128160 | 28.11.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102017128161 | 29.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017128161 | 28.11.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019105510 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102017128160 | 28.11.2017 | DE102017128159 | 28.11.2017 | DE102017128161 | 28.11.2017 |