EP3711162 - PROTECTION OF A FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTOR IN SWITCHING OPERATION AGAINST OVERLOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/39] | PROTECTION OF A FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR, WHICH IS OPERATED IN A SWITCHING MODE, AGAINST AN OVERLOAD CURRENT | ||
[2023/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÄRZ, Andreas Rodelweg 4 91227 Leinburg / DE | 02 /
BAKRAN, Mark-Matthias Josef-Felder-Str. 66 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 18833900.6 | 28.12.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018EP97090 | Priority number, date | EP20180154076 | 30.01.2018 Original published format: EP 18154076 | [2020/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019149437 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3711162 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3711162 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/082, H03K17/14 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
H03K17/0822 (EP,US);
H02M1/08 (US);
H03K17/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZ EINES IN EINEM SCHALTBETRIEB BETRIEBENEN FELDEFFEKTTRANSISTORS VOR EINEM ÜBERLASTSTROM | [2020/39] | English: | PROTECTION OF A FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTOR IN SWITCHING OPERATION AGAINST OVERLOAD | [2023/19] | French: | PROTECTION D'UN TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP FONCTIONNANT DANS LE MODE DE COMMUTATION CONTRE UN COURANT DE SURCHARGE | [2023/19] |
Former [2020/39] | PROTECTION OF A FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR, WHICH IS OPERATED IN A SWITCHING MODE, AGAINST AN OVERLOAD CURRENT | ||
Former [2020/39] | PROTECTION CONTRE UN COURANT DE SURCHARGE D'UN TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP UTILISÉ DANS UN MODE DE COMMUTATION | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 18.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4920447 (PEPPEL MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract ** column 5, line 19 - line 38 *; | [A]US5394287 (SAKATA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 9, line 21 - line 25; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5898557 (BABA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [YA]US2017163255 (GRAF ALFONS [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * paragraph [0110]; figures 4,5 * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0120] * [A] 1-10,13-15; | [YA]US2017331369 (SUGIMOTO KAORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10,13-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0042] * [A] 11,12 | by applicant | US2017163255 | US2017331369 |