EP3707857 - DEVICE FOR STORING DIGITAL KEYS FOR SIGNING TRANSACTIONS ON A BLOCKCHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2022 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CopSonic 1471 route de Saint-Nauphary 82000 Montauban / FR | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUIZ, Emmanuel 176 impasse Saint-Laurent 82370 Saint-nauphary / FR | 02 /
PILOTO FONSECA, Carlos, David 34 avenue des Pyrénées Résidence Demeures de l'Hers Villa 07 31780 CASTELGINEST / FR | 03 /
ALFONSO REYES, Ruben 1240 A chemin de Menescal 82290 Montbeton / FR | 04 /
ROETEN, Brian 1270 chemin de Menescal 82290 Montbeton / FR | [2020/52] |
Former [2020/38] | 01 /
RUIZ, Emmanuel 176 impasse Saint-Laurent 82370 Saint-nauphary / FR | ||
02 /
PILOTO FONSECA, Carlos, David 15 rue Jules Michelet 82000 Montauban / FR | |||
03 /
ALFONSO REYES, Ruben 1240 A chemin de Menescal 82290 Montbeton / FR | |||
04 /
ROETEN, Brian 1270 chemin de Menescal 82290 Montbeton / FR | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | Brevalex 56, Boulevard de l'Embouchure B.P. 27519 31075 Toulouse Cedex 2 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18833920.4 | 12.12.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018FR53211 | Priority number, date | FR20170062129 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1762129 | [2020/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019115936 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3707857 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04B11/00 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
H04L9/3234 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/3674 (US);
G06Q20/363 (US);
H04B11/00 (EP,US);
H04L9/0643 (KR,US);
H04L9/0825 (US);
H04L9/0869 (KR);
H04L9/0894 (KR);
H04L9/0897 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPEICHERN VON DIGITALEN SCHLÜSSELN ZUM SIGNIEREN VON TRANSAKTIONEN AUF EINER BLOCKCHAIN | [2020/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR STORING DIGITAL KEYS FOR SIGNING TRANSACTIONS ON A BLOCKCHAIN | [2020/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE CLÉS NUMÉRIQUES POUR SIGNER DES TRANSACTIONS SUR UNE CHAINE DE BLOCS | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 11.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 28.06.2022 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2022/50] | Cited in | International search | [T]WO2009066212 (NXP BV [NL], et al) [T] 1-10 * pages 3-4 *; | [T]EP2966792 (NXP BV [NL]) [T] 1-10 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] *; | [Y] - BAMERT TOBIAS ET AL, BlueWallet: The Secure Bitcoin Wallet, MEDICAL IMAGE COMPUTING AND COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTION - MICCAI 2015 : 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, MUNICH, GERMANY, OCTOBER 5-9, 2015; PROCEEDINGS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, CH, (20140910), ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-642-38287-1, XP047298907 [Y] 1-10 * sections 2 et 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-11851-2_5 | [Y] - Ledger, "Ledger Blue: an enterprise grade security device", (20161125), URL: https://blog.ledger.co/2016/11/25/ledger-blue-an-enterprise-grade-security-device/, (20180713), XP055492588 [Y] 1-10 * pages 2-4 * | [Y] - NEVENA LAZIC AND PURHAM AARABI, "Communication over an acoustic channel using data hiding techniques", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIME, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20061001), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TMM.2006.879880, ISSN 1520-9210, pages 918 - 924, XP009106139 [Y] 1-10 * section IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMM.2006.879880 | by applicant | FR20160055443 |