EP3729396 - METHOD FOR MANAGING A PLATOON OF TRUCKS ON THE BASIS OF INFORMATION RELATING TO THE TYRES WITH WHICH THE TRUCKS OF SAID PLATOON ARE EQUIPPED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMPROBST, Frédéric Manufacture Francaise Des Pneumatiques Michelin 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux CBS/CORP/J/PI- F35 Ladoux 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND CEDEX 9 / FR | 02 /
FANGEAT, Nicolas Manufacture Francaise Des Pneumatiques Michelin 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux CBS/CORP/J/PI- F35 Ladoux 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND CEDEX 9 / FR | 03 /
LEDOUX, Thomas Manufacture Francaise Des Pneumatiques Michelin 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux CBS/CORP/J/PI- F35 Ladoux 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND CEDEX 9 / FR | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | M.F.P. Michelin DCJ/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Redouté, Gilles Pierre M. F. P. Michelin Service juridique - Propriété Intellectuelle DCJ/PI - F35 - Site de Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18833978.2 | 18.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018FR53383 | Priority number, date | FR20170062908 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1762908 | [2020/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019122695 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3729396 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/00, G05D1/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G08G1/22 (EP,US);
B60W40/064 (US);
G05D1/0293 (EP,US);
G05D1/0297 (EP);
B60W2530/20 (US);
B60W2554/802 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | G08G1/00, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER KOLONNE VON LASTKRAFTWAGEN AUF BASIS VON INFORMATIONEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DEN REIFEN, MIT DENEN DIE LASTKRAFTWAGEN DER BESAGTEN KOLONNE AUSGERÜSTET SIND | [2020/44] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING A PLATOON OF TRUCKS ON THE BASIS OF INFORMATION RELATING TO THE TYRES WITH WHICH THE TRUCKS OF SAID PLATOON ARE EQUIPPED | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'UN PELOTON DE CAMIONS A PARTIR D'INFORMATIONS RELATIVES AUX PNEUMATIQUES EQUIPANT LES CAMIONS DUDIT PELOTON | [2024/24] |
Former [2020/44] | PROCEDE DE GESTION D'UN PELOTON DE CAMIONS A PARTIR D'INFORMATIONS RELATIVES AUX PNEUMATIQUES EQUIPANT LES CAMIONS DUDIT PELOTON | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 22.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.05.2024 | 16.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US5777451 (KOBAYASHI MASANORI [JP], et al); | [XI]US9632507 (KORN ALAN [US]); | [XI]US2017308097 (SWITKES JOSHUA P [US], et al) |