EP3713459 - MACHINE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De' Longhi Appliances S.r.l. Con Unico Socio Via L. Seitz 47 31100 Treviso / IT | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE' LONGHI, Giuseppe c/o DE' LONGHI APPLIANCES S.R.L. CON UNICO SOCIO - Via L. Seitz 47 31100 Treviso / IT | 02 /
TREVISAN, Gianpaolo c/o DE' LONGHI APPLIANCES S.R.L. CON UNICO SOCIO - Via L. Seitz 47 31100 Treviso / IT | 03 /
MAZZON, Renzo c/o DE' LONGHI APPLIANCES S.R.L. CON UNICO SOCIO - Via L. Seitz 47 31100 Treviso / IT | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 18834072.3 | 23.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018IT50230 | Priority number, date | IT20170134800 | 23.11.2017 Original published format: IT201700134800 | [2020/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019102514 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3713459 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3713459 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/06, A47J31/56, A47J31/057 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
A47J31/057 (EP,US);
A23F5/262 (US);
A47J31/002 (US);
A47J31/0652 (EP,US);
A47J31/5251 (US);
A47J31/5253 (US);
A47J31/5255 (US);
A47J31/56 (EP);
A23F5/26 (US);
A47J31/525 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GETRÄNKEN | [2020/40] | English: | MACHINE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES | [2020/40] | French: | MACHINE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 21.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2018 | AL | 10.11.2021 | CY | 10.11.2021 | CZ | 10.11.2021 | DK | 10.11.2021 | EE | 10.11.2021 | ES | 10.11.2021 | FI | 10.11.2021 | HR | 10.11.2021 | LT | 10.11.2021 | LV | 10.11.2021 | MC | 10.11.2021 | MK | 10.11.2021 | NL | 10.11.2021 | PL | 10.11.2021 | RO | 10.11.2021 | RS | 10.11.2021 | SE | 10.11.2021 | SI | 10.11.2021 | SK | 10.11.2021 | SM | 10.11.2021 | IE | 23.11.2021 | LU | 23.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | BG | 10.02.2022 | NO | 10.02.2022 | GR | 11.02.2022 | IS | 10.03.2022 | PT | 10.03.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 23.11.2018 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 10.11.2021 | |
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
IE | 23.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | CZ | 10.11.2021 | |
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 10.11.2021 | |
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
LU | 23.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 10.11.2021 | |
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 10.11.2021 | |
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 10.11.2021 | |
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | FI | 10.11.2021 | |
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 10.11.2021 | |
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 10.11.2021 | |
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 10.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XDAI]EP0771542 (ILLYCAFFE SPA [IT]) [XD] 12,18,20 * column 3, line 10 - column 6, line 48; figure - * [A] 1 [I] 19; | [A]WO2005094644 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 12-20 * page 4, line 32 - page 14, line 24; figure - *; | [XI]US2006096465 (HU RUGUO [US], et al) [X] 12,18,20 * paragraphs [0021] - [0036]; figure - * [I] 19; | [A]WO2009016490 (TUTTOESPRESSO SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 5, line 6 - page 17, line 24; figure - *; | [A]EP2353469 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [A] 1-11,13-15* paragraphs [0036] - [0057]; figure - *; | [YD]WO2014032110 (BREVILLE R & D PTY LTD [AU]) [YD] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * page 1, lines 4-11, 30,31 * * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 12 * * page 6, line 8 - page 8, line 18; figures 1-4,7-13 *; | [XDY]WO2016034255 (TUTTOESPRESSO SRL [IT]) [XD] 12,16-20 * page 8, lines 20-30 * * page 9, line 6 - page 12, line 21 * * page 22, line 7 - page 23, line 29 * * page 25, line 21 * * page 27, line 25 - page 28, line 27 * * page 29, lines 27-31 * * page 34, line 1 - page 44, line 27; figure - * [Y] 1-11,13-15; | [Y]US2017086473 (INGOLD JARED L [US]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0057] - [0059]; figure 9 * |