EP3728295 - BOTULINUM TOXIN CELL BINDING DOMAIN POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE FOR TREATMENTS OF FIBROSIS ASSOCIATED DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allergan, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, California 92612 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKY, Birgitte, PS 166 N. Waverly Street Orange, California 92866 / US | 02 /
BRIDEAU-ANDERSEN, Amy 3214 Sanfre de Toro San Clemente, California 92673 / US | 03 /
YOU, Hui 14201 Mirasol Irvine, California 92620 / US | 04 /
FRAIL, Donald, E. 27753 Hidden Trail Road Laguna Hills, California 92653 / US | 05 /
BRIN, Mitchell, F. 30 San Antonio Newport Beach, California 92660 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18834230.7 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US66868 | Priority number, date | US201762608119P | 20.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762608119 P | US201862727640P | 06.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862727640 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019126542 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728295 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/33, A61K38/48 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C12N9/52 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/4893 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (IL,US);
A61K9/0019 (IL,US);
A61P1/18 (EP,IL,US);
A61P13/08 (EP,IL,US);
A61P13/10 (EP,IL,US);
A61P17/02 (EP,IL,US);
A61P17/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61P17/08 (EP,IL,US);
A61P17/10 (EP,IL,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P43/00 (KR);
A61Q19/007 (IL,US);
A61Q19/008 (IL,US);
A61Q19/08 (IL,US);
C07K14/315 (IL,US);
C07K14/33 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12Y304/24069 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | BOTULINUMTOXIN-ZELLBINDUNGSDOMÄNEN-POLYPEPTIDE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR BEHANDLUNGEN VON FIBROSE-ASSOZIIERTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2020/44] | English: | BOTULINUM TOXIN CELL BINDING DOMAIN POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE FOR TREATMENTS OF FIBROSIS ASSOCIATED DISORDERS | [2020/44] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DU DOMAINE DE LIAISON CELLULAIRE DE TOXINE BOTULIQUE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION POUR DES TRAITEMENTS DE TROUBLES ASSOCIÉS À LA FIBROSE | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 16.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/11] | 09.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0005252 (AGRICULTURAL RESEARCH COUNCIL [ZA], et al) [X] 10-25,27,30-37 * whole document esp. seq id no 2; claims 3-4,6-8,13-16,22,26-27,32 *; | [X]US2005095251 (STEWARD LANCE E [US], et al) [X] 10-26,30-37 * whole document esp. seq id no 9; paragraphs [54,57,68,81,82] *; | [X]WO2009023549 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US], et al) [X] 30-37 * whole document esp. seq id no 5; paragraphs [39,138] *; | [X]WO2009042165 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [X] 1-37 * whole document esp. seq id no 14; paragraphs [14-16, 37, 58, 101,146]; claims 1,8-9 *; | [X]WO2011018665 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [X] 10-26,30-37 * whole document esp. seq id no 72; page 20 *; | [X]KR20170138245 (AGENCY DEFENSE DEV [KR]) [X] 30-37 * whole document esp. seq id no 8; paragraphs [17,24]; claims 8,9 *; | [Y] - ANNA I. ARNO ET AL, "Up-to-date approach to manage keloids and hypertrophic scars: A useful guide", BURNS., GB, (20141101), vol. 40, no. 7, doi:10.1016/j.burns.2014.02.011, ISSN 0305-4179, pages 1255 - 1266, XP055537740 [Y] 1-38 * whole document esp. pages 1255,1261 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.burns.2014.02.011 | [Y] - GUORUI YAO ET AL, "Crystal Structure of the Receptor-Binding Domain of Botulinum Neurotoxin Type HA, Also Known as Type FA or H", TOXINS, (20170308), vol. 9, no. 93, doi:10.3390/toxins9030093, pages 1 - 13, XP055500224 [Y] 1-38 * whole document esp. pages 1,8-9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/toxins9030093 | [Y] - ALON BEN DAVID ET AL, "Expression, purification and characterization of the receptor-binding domain of botulinum neurotoxin serotype B as a vaccine candidate", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION., SAN DIEGO, CA., (20150601), vol. 110, doi:10.1016/j.pep.2015.02.008, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 122 - 129, XP055562670 [Y] 1-38 * whole document esp. abstract, page 128 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pep.2015.02.008 | [Y] - RICHARD M. KOSTRZEWA ET AL, "Botulinum neurotoxin: Progress in negating its neurotoxicity; and in extending its therapeutic utility via molecular engineering. MiniReview", PEPTIDES, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20151001), vol. 72, doi:10.1016/j.peptides.2015.07.003, ISSN 0196-9781, pages 80 - 87, XP055562643 [Y] 1-38 * whole document esp. abstract and pages 82,83,84 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.peptides.2015.07.003 | [YP] - JONATHAN DAVIES ET AL, "Variations in the Botulinum Neurotoxin Binding Domain and the Potential for Novel Therapeutics", TOXINS, CH, (20181001), vol. 10, no. 10, doi:10.3390/toxins10100421, ISSN 2072-6651, page 421, XP055562661 [YP] 1-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/toxins10100421 | [YP] - EVAN AUSTIN ET AL, "The Cellular Response of Keloids and Hypertrophic Scars to Botulinum Toxin A : A Comprehensive Literature Review", DERMATOLOGIC SURGERY., NEW YORK, US, (20180201), vol. 44, no. 2, doi:10.1097/DSS.0000000000001360, ISSN 1076-0512, pages 149 - 157, XP055562632 [YP] 1-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/DSS.0000000000001360 | by applicant | US8962548 | US296006 | US5008110 | US5364791 | US5464758 | US5514578 | US5591767 | US5683712 | US5814618 | US5874534 | US5899880 | US5902565 | US5935934 | US5948433 | US5965154 | US5980948 | US6004286 | US6010715 | US6010478 | US6013050 | US6051239 | US6053889 | US6165500 | US6306423 | US6312708 | US6383509 | US6506399 | US6585993 | US6747014 | US6923976 | US7172764 | US7255865 | US7645570 | US7704524 | US7727537 | US7749514 | US7892565 | US8067231 | US8092788 | US8124357 | US8168206 | US8398997 | US8404249 | US8486422 | US8512992 | US8518414 | US8568740 | US8603028 | US8618261 | US8642047 | US8697413 | US8801659 | US8841111 | US8926991 | US8974774 | US9044477 | US9050336 | US9107815 | US9144692 | US9161970 | US9180081 | US9211248 | US9278140 | US9284545 | US9622957 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. BAE48264 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. P18640 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. P19321 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. EF378947 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. AFV91344 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. ABS41202 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. X74162 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. BAQ12790 | - DOVER et al., J Infect Dis., (20140000), vol. 209, no. 2, pages 192 - 202 | - MASLANKA et al., 1 Infect Dis., (20160000), vol. 213, no. 3, pages 379 - 385 | - PECK et al., Toxins (Review, (20170000), vol. 9, no. 1, page 38 | - ROSSETTO et al., Nature Reviews Microbiol, (20140000), vol. 12, pages 535 - 49 | - ARNDT et al., JMol Biol., (20060000), vol. 362, no. 4, pages 733 - 42 | - HILL et al., JBacteriol, (20070000), vol. 189, pages 818 - 32 | - RAPHAEL et al., Appl Environ Microbiol, (20120000), vol. 76, no. 14, pages 4805 - 12 | - KALB et al., Anal Chem., (20140000), vol. 86, pages 3254 - 62 | - MONTECUCCO et al., MBio, (20150000), vol. 6, pages e02131 - 14 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. PODPI1 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. CAA44558 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. KG015617 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. P04958 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. AF488749 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. AB232927 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. CAA47060 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. X54254 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. P19321 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. JX424539 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. X74162 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. Q60393 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. BAQ12790 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. OT022244 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. AOA242DI27 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. AB443580 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. X73423 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. DQ185900 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. EU341307 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. HM153705 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. FJ981696 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. JQ954969 | - RISLER et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19880000), vol. 204, pages 1019 - 1029 | - NIEFIND et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 219, pages 481 - 497 | - OVERINGTON et al., Protein Science, (19920000), vol. 1, pages 216 - 226 | - THOMAS et al., Chemical Communications, (20120000), vol. 48, pages 10559 - 10561 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. P10844 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. Q00496 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. P30996 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. Q45851 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. P30995 | - ZUCKERMANN, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19920000), vol. 114, page 10646 | - CHADDOCK, Trends Biochem. Sci., (20020000), vol. 27, pages 552 - 558 | - SCHIAND, Physio. Rev., (20000000), vol. 80, pages 717 - 755 | - LI, Biochemistry, (20000000), vol. 39, pages 6466 - 6474 | - MONTECUCCO, Trends Biochem. Sci., (19930000), vol. 18, pages 324 - 327 | - LI, Toxin Rev., (19990000), vol. 18, pages 95 - 112 | - MONTECUCCO, Q. Rev. Biophys, (19950000), vol. 28, pages 423 - 472 | - LI, Biochemistry, (20000000), vol. 39, pages 2399 - 2405 | - AGARWAL, Biochemistry, (20050000), vol. 44, pages 8291 - 8302 | - MIZANUR et al., PLoS One, (20140000), vol. 9, no. 4, page e95188 | - ATASSI et al., Protein J., (20040000), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 39 - 52 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - GISH et al., Nature Genet, (19930000), vol. 3, pages 266 - 272 | - MADDEN et al., Meth. Enzymol., (19960000), vol. 266, pages 131 - 141 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ZHANG et al., Genome Res., (19970000), vol. 7, pages 649 - 656 | - WITTLIEB et al., PNAS USA, (20060000), vol. 103, no. 16, pages 6208 - 11 | - PANKOW et al., PLoS One, (20070000), vol. 2, no. 9, page e782 | - KHALTURIN et al., PLoS Biol., (20080000), vol. 6, no. 11, page e278 | - "Introducing Cloned Genes into Cultured Mammalian Cells", Molecular Cloning A Laboratory Manual, (20010000), vol. 3, pages 16.1 - 16.62 | - MARTIN JORDAN; FLORIAN WORM, "Transfection of Adherent and Suspended Cells by Calcium Phosphate", Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ymeth.2003.11.011, pages 136 - 143, XP004505455 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymeth.2003.11.011 | - CHUN ZHANG et al., "Polyethylenimine Strategies for Plasmid Delivery to Brain-Derived Cells", Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ymeth.2003.11.004, pages 144 - 150, XP004505456 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymeth.2003.11.004 | - BIEWENGA et al., J. Neurosci. Methods, (19970000), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 67 - 75 | - O'BRIEN et al., Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 121 - 125 | - M. GOLZIO et al., Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 126 - 135 | - GRESCH et al., Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 151 - 163 | - BLESCH et al., Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 164 - 172 | - FEDERICO et al., MethodsMol. Biol., (20030000), vol. 229, pages 3 - 15 | - POESCHLA et al., Curr. Opin. Mol. Ther., (20030000), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 529 - 540 | - BENIHOUD et al., Curr. Opin. Biotechnol., (19990000), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 440 - 447 | - BUELER et al., Biol. Chem., (19990000), vol. 380, no. 6, pages 613 - 622 | - LAI et al., DNA Cell Biol., (20020000), vol. 21, no. 12, pages 895 - 913 | - BURTON et al., DNA Cell Biol., (20020000), vol. 21, no. 12, pages 915 - 936 | - GRANDI, Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 179 - 186 | - FROLOV, PNAS USA, (19960000), vol. 93, no. 21, pages 11371 - 11377 | - EHRENGRUBER ET, Brain Res. Bull., (20020000), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 13 - 22 | - KOST et al., Trends Biotechnol, (20020000), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 173 - 180 | - HUSER et al., Am. J. Pharmacogenomics, (20030000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 53 - 63 | - HERMENS, J. Neurosci. Methods, (19970000), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 85 - 98 | - MIZUGUCHI et al., Adv. Drug Deliv. Rev., (20010000), vol. 52, no. 3, pages 165 - 176 | - TONINI et al., MethodsMol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 285, pages 141 - 148 | - RECILLAS-TARGA et al., Methods Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 267, pages 417 - 433 | - WOLKOWICZ, Methods Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 246, pages 391 - 411 | - NALDINI et al., Science, (19960000), vol. 272, no. 5259, pages 263 - 267 | - RAI et al., Curr. Sci., (20010000), vol. 80, no. 9, pages 1121 - 1128 | - GASSNER et al., Plast Reconstr Surg, (20000000), vol. 105, pages 1948 - 1953 | - ZHIBO et al., Plast Reconstr Surg., (20090000), vol. 124, no. 5, pages 275 - 277 | - DOKUR et al., Ann Surg Treat Res., (20170000), vol. 93, no. 1, pages 50 - 56 | - RAGHU et al., Am J Respir Crit Care Med, (20060000), vol. 174, pages 810 - 816 | - RAGHU et al., Am J Respir Crit Care Med, (20110000), vol. 183, pages 788 - 824 | - THABUT et al., Annals of Internal Medicine, (20090000), vol. 151, pages 767 - 774 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. AF488749 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. BAE48264 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. P19321 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. ABS41202 |