EP3657192 - ULTRA-SMALL HIGH-SENSITIVITY MAGNETIC SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI INTECC CO., LTD. 3-100 Akatsuki-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | [2023/40] |
Former [2020/22] | For all designated states Asahi Intecc Co., Ltd. 3-100 Akatsuki-cho Seto-shi, Aichi 489-0071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONKURA, Yoshinobu 33-10 Aza-toosendai Ooaza-ogawa Higashiura-cho Chita-gun Aichi 470-2102 / JP | 02 /
HONKURA, Shinpei 33-10 Aza-toosendai Ooaza-ogawa Higashiura-cho Chita-gun Aichi 470-2102 / JP | 03 /
KUDO, Kazue 1-27-1 Mitsuya-cho Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 454-0831 / JP | 04 /
TANABE, Junichi Aries 2 1-20-1 Matsuba-cho Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 454-0818 / JP | 05 /
KIKUCHI, Eiki Zugama 109 Arao-machi Tokai-shi Aichi 476-0003 / JP | [2023/40] |
Former [2020/22] | 01 /
HONKURA Yoshinobu 33-10 Aza-toosendai Ooaza-ogawa Higashiura-cho Chita-gun Aichi 470-2102 / JP | ||
02 /
HONKURA Shinpei 33-10 Aza-toosendai Ooaza-ogawa Higashiura-cho Chita-gun Aichi 470-2102 / JP | |||
03 /
KUDO Kazue 1-27-1 Mitsuya-cho Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 454-0831 / JP | |||
04 /
TANABE Junichi Aries 2 1-20-1 Matsuba-cho Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 454-0818 / JP | |||
05 /
KIKUCHI Eiki Zugama 109 Arao-machi Tokai-shi Aichi 476-0003 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/40] |
Former [2020/22] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 18834783.5 | 22.05.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018JP19705 | Priority number, date | JP20170141410 | 21.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017141410 | [2020/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019017066 | Date: | 24.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657192 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3657192 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/06 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
G01R33/06 (EP);
G01R33/0283 (US);
H10B61/00 (US);
H10N50/01 (US);
H10N59/00 (EP,US);
G01R33/063 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | G01R33/06, H01L43/00 | ||
Former IPC [2020/22] | G01R33/02, H01L43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRAKLEINER HOCHSENSITIVER MAGNETSENSOR | [2020/22] | English: | ULTRA-SMALL HIGH-SENSITIVITY MAGNETIC SENSOR | [2020/22] | French: | CAPTEUR MAGNÉTIQUE ULTRA-PETIT À HAUTE SENSIBILITÉ | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2020 | Translation filed | 16.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 08.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP4529783B ; | [Y]US2014247042 (LEI XIAOFENG [CN], et al); | [Y]US2016238673 (HONKURA YOSHINOBU [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH03156391 (TDK CORP); | [A]JP2003167037 (TAMA ELECTRIC); | [A]JP2005147998 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS); | [Y]US2006202291 (KOLB STEFAN [DE], et al); | [Y]JP2009503443 ; | [Y]JP2014153309 (MAGNE DESIGN CORP); | [Y]EP2813859 (NXP BV [NL]); | [YA]JP5839527B ; | [Y]US9577185 (LEE DOK WON [US], et al); | [PA]JP6256962B | by applicant | JPS583975 | JP2014042055 | JP2014153309 | JP2015134166 | JP2017012840 |