Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
22.02.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.09.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.07.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.07.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.03.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
26.03.2021 | Change - classification | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
26.03.2021 | Change - classification | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
25.09.2020 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
25.09.2020 | Change - extension states | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] |
28.07.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.04.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
24.04.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
31.03.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.03.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.02.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.02.2020 | Change - representative | |
18.02.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.06.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.02.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication |