EP3655890 - TAMPER-EVIDENT ITEM AND ITEM VALIDATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Birde Technologies LLC 4436 Auburn Drive Flower Mound, Texas 75028 / US | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORGAN-ROTTMAN, Michal Carrie 4436 Auburn Drive Flower Mound Texas 75028 / US | 02 /
PELLERIN, Anne Marie 9585 Silver Lake Drive Leesburg Florida 34788 / US | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/22] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P O Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18835669.5 | 05.07.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018US40888 | Priority number, date | US201762534392P | 19.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762534392 P | US201762546537P | 16.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762546537 P | US201762609151P | 21.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762609151 P | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019018134 | Date: | 24.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3655890 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06, G08B13/24, G08B13/12, G08B3/10, G08B5/36 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
G08B3/10 (EP);
G06K19/073 (US);
G06F13/42 (US);
G06Q10/0832 (US);
G06Q10/0833 (US);
G06Q30/018 (EP);
G08B13/126 (EP);
G08B13/2445 (EP);
G08B5/36 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/22] | G06K19/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Title | German: | MANIPULATIONSSICHERER ARTIKEL SOWIE SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VALIDIERUNG VON ARTIKELN | [2020/22] | English: | TAMPER-EVIDENT ITEM AND ITEM VALIDATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2020/22] | French: | ARTICLE INVIOLABLE ET SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE VALIDATION D'ARTICLE | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 12.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2709035 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0032] - [0048]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2010052308 (BALINSKY HELEN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0031] *; | [Y]US2006010503 (INOUE YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] - [0031] - [0053] - [0062] * | International search | [XY]US2014077928 (MARKEL SHLOMO [IL], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4/1, 4/2 * entire document (especially Abstract, para [0004], [0014]-[0018], [0021], [0022], [0024], [0026], [0028], Claim 1). * [Y] 3, 4/3, 22-25; | [Y]US2005242950 (LINDSAY JEFFREY D [US], et al) [Y] 3, 4/3, 22-25 * entire document (especially para [0047]-[0049], [0058]). *; | [Y]EP0137767 (Khandwala et al.) [Y] 24, 25/24 * entire document (especially col. 21, lines 27-34). *; | [A]US2005039040 (RANSOM DOUGLAS S [CA], et al) [A] 1-4, 22-25 * entire document. *; | [A]US6809645 (MASON TIMOTHY E [US]) [A] 1-4, 22-25 * entire document. * | by applicant | EP2709035 | US2010052308 | US2006010503 |