EP3648532 - DATA PROCESSING METHOD, MOBILITY MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENG, Qiang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18835888.1 | 02.07.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018CN93997 | Priority number, date | CN201710592127 | 19.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710592127 | [2020/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019015473 | Date: | 24.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3648532 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3648532 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
H04W28/0942 (EP);
H04W72/1268 (CN);
H04W28/10 (US);
H04W28/0252 (EP);
H04W28/0284 (EP,US);
H04W28/0831 (EP);
H04W28/0867 (EP);
H04W28/088 (EP);
H04W72/1273 (CN);
H04W72/23 (CN);
H04L1/1607 (CN);
H04L1/18 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, MOBILITÄTSVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄT | [2020/19] | English: | DATA PROCESSING METHOD, MOBILITY MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2020/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE MOBILITÉ ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2020 | Translation filed | 29.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 26.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2018 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | ES | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | IT | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | MT | 31.03.2021 | NL | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IE | 02.07.2021 | LU | 02.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | FR | 31.07.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 02.07.2018 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 02.07.2021 | ||
LU | 02.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HU | 02.07.2018 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 02.07.2021 | ||
LU | 02.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 02.07.2018 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 02.07.2021 | ||
LU | 02.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 02.07.2021 | ||
LU | 02.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 02.07.2021 | ||
LU | 02.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 02.07.2021 | ||
LU | 02.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 02.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
FR | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2605606 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-28 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0174] ** paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0197] *; | [XI] - INTEL, "CN Overload Control for Control Plane Only PDN Connection", vol. SA WG2, no. Kaohsiung, Taiwan; 20161017 - 20161021, (20161011), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-165567_CONGESTIONCONTROLSUPPORT_R1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_117_Kaohsiung_City/Docs/, (20161011), XP051169552 [X] 1,9,13,21,27 * paragraph [Section 2 "Discussion"] * [I] 2-8,10-12,14-20,22-26,28 | International search | [A]CN102056112 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]CN102387495 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]CN103889009 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]EP2876927 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-26* entire document *; | [X]CN106961653 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-26 * description, paragraphs 0011-0160 *; | [X] - INTEL., "CN Overload Control for Control Plane Only PDN Connection", 3GPP SA WG2 Meeting #117 S 2-165567, (20161021), XP051169552 [X] 1-26 * , sections 2-3 * |