EP3860890 - WHEELSET AND DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A RAIL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schweizerische Bundesbahnen SBB Personenverkehr, Operating Wylerstrasse 123/125 3000 Bern 65 / CH | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON ARX, Raphael Schweizerische Bundesbahnen SBB Wylerstrasse 125 3000 Bern 65 / CH | 02 /
GEHRIG, Urs Schweizerische Bundesbahnen SBB Hilfikerstrasse 3 3000 Bern 65 / CH | 03 /
VILFROY, André Schweizerische Bundesbahnen SBB Wylerstrasse 125 3000 Bern 65 / CH | 04 /
GROSSENBACHER, Thomas Schweizerische Bundesbahnen SBB Bollwerk 10 3000 Bern 65 / CH | 05 /
NEUENSCHWANDER, Christoph Schweizerische Bundesbahnen SBB Wylerstrasse 125 3000 Bern 65 / CH | 06 /
SIGRIST, Martin Creaholic SA Rue Centrale 115 2503 Biel / CH | 07 /
MAST, Markus Creaholic SA Rue Centrale 115 2503 Biel / CH | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [2023/25] |
Former [2021/32] | Rentsch Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 203 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 18836256.0 | 21.12.2018 | [2021/32] | WO2018EP86773 | Priority number, date | WO2018EP76914 | 03.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/EP2018/076914 | [2021/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020069766 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3860890 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3860890 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60T1/10, B60L7/10, B61H9/06, B60M3/06, B60T13/58, F16D61/00, H02K7/18, H02P3/18, B61C3/02, B60T13/66, B60T17/22 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
B60T1/10 (EP);
B60L15/2009 (EP);
B60L7/18 (EP);
B60M3/06 (EP);
B60T13/586 (EP);
B60T13/662 (EP);
B60T13/665 (EP);
B60T17/228 (EP);
B61C3/02 (EP);
B61H5/00 (EP);
B61H9/06 (EP);
F16D61/00 (EP);
H02J7/1415 (EP);
H02K5/10 (EP);
H02K7/1846 (EP);
H02P3/18 (EP);
B60L2200/26 (EP);
B60L2220/42 (EP);
H02K2213/03 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP);
Y02T30/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADSATZ UND ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EIN SCHIENENFAHRZEUG | [2021/32] | English: | WHEELSET AND DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A RAIL VEHICLE | [2021/32] | French: | ESSIEU MONTÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 26.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | MC | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 21.06.2023 | |
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 21.09.2023 | |
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 21.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1804363 (LANDERT MOTOREN AG [CH]) [X] 1-29 * paragraphs [0001] - [0011] - [0029]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102006044964 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-29 * paragraph [0074] *; | [X]EP2080647 (SBZ SCHOERLING BROCK ZWEIWEGET [DE]) [X] 1-29 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 34]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP2476573 (KINGHORN JOHN [GB]) [X] 1,23-29* paragraphs [0001] - [0017] - [0 27] , [0 28]; figures 1, 4 *; | [X]WO2016157146 (TRANSNET SOC LTD [ZA]) [X] 1-29 * pages 10-12; figure 1 * * abstract * * page 18 * |