EP3728296 - BOTULINUM TOXIN CELL BINDING DOMAIN POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE FOR SKIN REJUVENATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allergan, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, California 92612 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKY, Birgitte, PS 166 N. Waverly Street Orange, California 92866 / US | 02 /
BRIDEAU-ANDERSEN, Amy 3214 Sanfre de Toro San Clemente, California 92673 / US | 03 /
YOU, Hui 14201 Mirasol Irvine, California 92620 / US | 04 /
MALIK, Shiazah, Z. 49 Waterman Irvine, California 92602 / US | 05 /
FRAIL, Donald, E. 27753 Hidden Trail Road Laguna Hills, California 92653 / US | 06 /
BRIN, Mitchell, F. 30 San Antonio Newport Beach, California 92660 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18836329.5 | 20.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US66800 | Priority number, date | US201762608119P | 20.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762608119 P | US201862727640P | 06.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862727640 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019126502 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728296 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/33, A61K38/48 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C12N9/52 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/4893 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (IL,US);
A61K9/0019 (IL,US);
A61P1/18 (EP,IL,US);
A61P13/08 (EP,IL,US);
A61P13/10 (EP,IL,US);
A61P17/02 (EP,IL,US);
A61P17/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61P17/08 (EP,IL,US);
A61P17/10 (EP,IL,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P43/00 (KR);
A61Q19/007 (IL,US);
A61Q19/008 (IL,US);
A61Q19/08 (IL,US);
C07K14/315 (IL,US);
C07K14/33 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12Y304/24069 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDE DER BOTULINUMTOXIN-ZELLBINDUNGSDOMÄNE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG ZUR HAUTVERJÜNGUNG | [2020/44] | English: | BOTULINUM TOXIN CELL BINDING DOMAIN POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE FOR SKIN REJUVENATION | [2020/44] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DU DOMAINE DE LIAISON CELLULAIRE DE TOXINE BOTULIQUE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION POUR LE RAJEUNISSEMENT DE LA PEAU | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 17.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/11] | 09.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005095251 (STEWARD LANCE E [US], et al) [X] 1-18,24-29 * whole document esp. paragraph [54,57,68,81,82], seq id no 9 *; | [X]WO2009023549 (UNIV ROCHESTER [US], et al) [X] 26-31* whole document esp. seq id no 5; paragraphs [39,138] *; | [X]WO2009042165 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [X] 1-20,24-31 * whole document esp. seq id no 14; paragraphs [14,15,16,37,58, 101, 146]; claims 1,8-9 *; | [X]WO2011018665 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [X] 1-17,20,24-27 * whole document esp. seq id no 72, page 20 *; | [Y]US2012195878 (HAAG-MOLKENTELLER CORNELIA C [US], et al) [Y] 1-37 * whole document esp. paragraphs [55,63,64] *; | [Y]US2015166972 (DONG MIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-37 * whole document esp. claims; paragraph [101] *; | [Y]WO2017063743 (MERZ PHARMA GMBH & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-37 * whole document esp. claims, paragraphs [110,112] *; | [Y]WO2017203038 (IPSEN BIOPHARM LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-37 * whole document esp. seq id no 1 and pages 19-20 *; | [X]KR20170138245 (AGENCY DEFENSE DEV [KR]) [X] 26-31 * whole document esp. seq id no 8; paragraphs [17,24]; claims 8,9 *; | [XP]WO2018109447 (UNIV SHEFFIELD [GB]) [XP] 1-37 * whole document esp. seq id 1; pages 1, 7, 44-45 * | by applicant | US8962548 | USD296006S | US5008110 | US5364791 | US5464758 | US5514578 | US5591767 | US5683712 | US5814618 | US5874534 | US5899880 | US5902565 | US5935934 | US5948433 | US5965154 | US5980948 | US6004286 | US6010715 | US6010478 | US6013050 | US6051239 | US6053889 | US6165500 | US6306423 | US6312708 | US6383509 | US6506399 | US6585993 | US6747014 | US6923976 | US7172764 | US7255865 | US7645570 | US7704524 | US7727537 | US7749514 | US7838011 | US7892565 | US8067231 | US8092788 | US8124357 | US8168206 | US8398997 | US8404249 | US8486422 | US8512992 | US8518414 | US8568740 | US8603028 | US8618261 | US8642047 | US8697413 | US8801659 | US8841111 | US8926991 | US8974774 | US9044477 | US9050336 | US9107815 | US9144692 | US9161970 | US9180081 | US9211248 | US9278140 | US9284545 | US9622957 | US9724287 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. BAE48264 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. P18640 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. P19321 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. EF378947 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. AFV91344 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. ABS41202 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. X74162 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. BAQ12790 | - DOVER et al., J Infect Dis., (20140000), vol. 209, no. 2, pages 192 - 202 | - MASLANKA et al., 1 Infect Dis., (20160000), vol. 213, no. 3, pages 379 - 385 | - PECK et al., Toxins (Review, (20170000), vol. 9, no. 1, page 38 | - ROSSETTO et al., Nature Reviews Microbiol, (20140000), vol. 12, pages 535 - 49 | - ARNDT et al., JMol Biol., (20060000), vol. 362, no. 4, pages 733 - 42 | - HILL et al., JBacteriol, (20070000), vol. 189, pages 818 - 32 | - RAPHAEL et al., Appl Environ Microbiol, (20120000), vol. 76, no. 14, pages 4805 - 12 | - KALB et al., Anal Chem., (20140000), vol. 86, pages 3254 - 62 | - MONTECUCCO et al., MBio, (20150000), vol. 6, pages e02131 - 14 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. CAA44558 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. KG015617 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. BAQ12790 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. P04958 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. AF488749 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. AB232927 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. CAA47060 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. P18640 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. X54254 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. P19321 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. EF378947 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. JX424539 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. ABS41202 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. X74162 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. Q60393 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. OT022244 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. AOA242DI27 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. AB443580 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. X73423 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. DQ185900 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. HM153705 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. FJ981696 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. JQ954969 | - RISLER et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19880000), vol. 204, pages 1019 - 1029 | - NIEFIND et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 219, pages 481 - 497 | - OVERINGTON et al., Protein Science, (19920000), vol. 1, pages 216 - 226 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. PODPI1 | - THOMAS et al., Chemical Communications, (20120000), vol. 48, pages 10559 - 10561 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. P10844 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. Q00496 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. P30996 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. Q45851 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. P30995 | - "UNIPROT", Database accession no. PODPI19 | - ZUCKERMANN, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19920000), vol. 114, page 10646 | - CHADDOCK, Trends Biochem. Sci., (20020000), vol. 27, pages 552 - 558 | - SCHIAND et al., Physio. Rev., (20000000), vol. 80, pages 717 - 755 | - LI et al., Biochemistry, (20000000), vol. 39, pages 6466 - 6474 | - MONTECUCCO et al., Trends Biochem. Sci., (19930000), vol. 18, pages 324 - 327 | - LI et al., Toxin Rev., (19990000), vol. 18, pages 95 - 112 | - MONTECUCCO et al., Q. Rev. Biophys, (19950000), vol. 28, pages 423 - 472 | - LI et al., Biochemistry, (20000000), vol. 39, pages 2399 - 2405 | - AGARWAL et al., Biochemistry, (20050000), vol. 44, pages 8291 - 8302 | - MIZANUR et al., PLoS One, (20140000), vol. 9, no. 4, page e95188 | - ATASSI et al., Protein J., (20040000), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 39 - 52 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - GISH et al., Nature Genet, (19930000), vol. 3, pages 266 - 272 | - MADDEN et al., Meth. Enzymol., (19960000), vol. 266, pages 131 - 141 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ZHANG et al., Genome Res., (19970000), vol. 7, pages 649 - 656 | - WITTLIEB, PNAS USA, (20060000), vol. 103, no. 16, pages 6208 - 11 | - PANKOW, PLoS One, (20070000), vol. 2, no. 9, page e782 | - KHALTURIN et al., PLoS Biol., (20080000), vol. 6, no. 11, page e278 | - "Introducing Cloned Genes into Cultured Mammalian Cells", Molecular Cloning A Laboratory Manual, (20010000), vol. 3, pages 16.1 - 16.62 | - MARTIN JORDAN; FLORIAN WORM, "Transfection of Adherent and Suspended Cells by Calcium Phosphate", Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ymeth.2003.11.011, pages 136 - 143, XP004505455 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymeth.2003.11.011 | - CHUN ZHANG et al., "Polyethylenimine Strategies for Plasmid Delivery to Brain-Derived Cells", Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ymeth.2003.11.004, pages 144 - 150, XP004505456 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymeth.2003.11.004 | - BIEWENGA et al., J. Neurosci. Methods, (19970000), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 67 - 75 | - O'BRIEN et al., Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 121 - 125 | - M. GOLZIO et al., Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 126 - 135 | - GRESCH et al., Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 151 - 163 | - BLESCH et al., Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 164 - 172 | - FEDERICO et al., MethodsMol. Biol., (20030000), vol. 229, pages 3 - 15 | - POESCHLA et al., Curr. Opin. Mol. Ther., (20030000), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 529 - 540 | - BENIHOUD et al., Curr. Opin. Biotechnol., (19990000), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 440 - 447 | - BUELER et al., Biol. Chem., (19990000), vol. 380, no. 6, pages 613 - 622 | - LAI et al., DNA Cell Biol., (20020000), vol. 21, no. 12, pages 895 - 913 | - BURTON et al., DNA Cell Biol., (20020000), vol. 21, no. 12, pages 915 - 936 | - GRANDI et al., Methods, (20040000), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 179 - 186 | - FROLOV et al., PNAS USA, (19960000), vol. 93, no. 21, pages 11371 - 11377 | - EHRENGRUBER et al., Brain Res. Bull., (20020000), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 13 - 22 | - KOST et al., Trends Biotechnol, (20020000), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 173 - 180 | - HUSER et al., Am. J. Pharmacogenomics, (20030000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 53 - 63 | - HERMENS et al., J. Neurosci. Methods, (19970000), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 85 - 98 | - MIZUGUCHI et al., Adv. Drug Deliv. Rev., (20010000), vol. 52, no. 3, pages 165 - 176 | - TONINI et al., Methods Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 285, pages 141 - 148 | - RECILLAS-TARGA et al., Methods Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 267, pages 417 - 433 | - WOLKOWICZ et al., Methods Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 246, pages 391 - 411 | - NALDINI et al., Science, (19960000), vol. 272, no. 5259, pages 263 - 267 | - RAI et al., Curr. Sci., (20010000), vol. 80, no. 9, pages 1121 - 1128 | - SCHWARB et al., Eur JPharm Biopharm, (19990000), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 261 - 7 | - HARGENS et al., Ballistometry, Handbook of Non-Invasive Methods and the Skin, Cit-C Press, (19950000), pages 359 - 366 | - BONAPARTE et al., J Med Eng Technol, (20130000), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 208 - 12 | - BONAPARTE et al., JAMA Facial Plast Surg., (20150000), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 256 - 63 | - FITZPATRICK et al., Archives of Dermatology, (19880000), vol. 124, no. 6, pages 869 - 871 | - SONTI et al., Int J Cosmet Sci, (20130000), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 156 - 162 | - KLIGMAN et al., J. Soc. Cosmet. Chem., (19870000), vol. 82, pages 171 - 177 | - PACKMAN et al., J. Soc. Cosmetic Chem., (19780000), vol. 29, page 70 | - MAES et al., Int J Cosmet Sci, (19830000), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 189 - 200 | - YOUN et al., Skin Res. Technol., (20020000), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 168 - 72 | - KLIGMAN et al., J. Soc. Cosmet. Chem., (19860000), vol. 37, pages 369 - 374 | - BAUMANN, Journal of Cosmetics, Dermatological Sciences and Applications, (20140000), vol. 4, pages 78 - 84 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. BAE48264 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. P18640 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. P19321 | - "GENBANK", Database accession no. AFV91344 |