EP3728350 - ZIRCONOCENE-TITANOCENE CATALYST SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Linfeng 4015 Tuscan Shores Dr. Missouri City, TX 77459 / US | 02 /
PEARSON, David M. 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 03 /
TILSTON, Michael W. 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 04 /
KAPUR, Mridula 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 05 /
REIB, Robert N. P. O. Box 8361 South Charleston, WV 25303 / US | 06 /
WHITED, Stephanie M. 437 MacCorkle Avenue, SW South Charleston, WV 25303 / US | [2020/48] |
Former [2020/44] | 01 /
CHEN, Linfeng 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | ||
02 /
PEARSON, David M. 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | |||
03 /
TILSTON, Michael W. 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | |||
04 /
KAPUR, Mridula 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | |||
05 /
REIB, Robert N. P. O. Box 8361 South Charleston, WV 25303 / US | |||
06 /
WHITED, Stephanie M. 437 MacCorkle Avenue, SW South Charleston, WV 25303 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18836745.2 | 13.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US65338 | Priority number, date | US201762599959P | 18.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762599959 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019125881 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728350 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3728350 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/16, C08F4/659 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/65916 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F10/02 (US)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/65904 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65925 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZIRKONOCEN-TITANOCEN-KATALYSATORSYSTEM | [2020/44] | English: | ZIRCONOCENE-TITANOCENE CATALYST SYSTEM | [2020/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CATALYSEUR DE ZIRCONOCÈNE-TITANOCÈNE | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 08.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I]US5767032 (HOKKANEN HARRI [FI], et al); | [XI]US9045569 (JENSEN MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [XI]EP3255066 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | by applicant | USAND5693838 | EP0594218 | US3324095 | US3709853 | BE839380 | US4003712 | US4011382 | US4302566 | US4453399 | US4543399 | US4588790 | US4665208 | US4874734 | US4882400 | US4908463 | US4924018 | US4952540 | US4968827 | US4988783 | US4994534 | US5091352 | US5103031 | US5157137 | US5204419 | US5206199 | US5235081 | EP0561476 | US5248801 | US5308815 | EP0279586 | WO9410180 | US5329032 | US5352749 | US5391793 | US5391529 | US5462999 | US5541270 | US5627242 | EP0649992 | US5665818 | EP0794200 | EP0634421 | US5677375 | EP0802202 | US6242545 | US6258903 | US6489408 | US2006173123 | US8247588 | US8404612 | US9045569 |