EP3729055 - METHOD AND SENSOR FOR DETECTING PRESENCE OR ABSENCE OF A CONTAMINANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radiometer Medical ApS Åkandevej 21 2700 Brønshøj / DK | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRISCHAUF, Peter c/o Åkandevej 21 2700 Brønshøj / DK | 02 /
TAAGAARD, Michael c/o Åkandevej 21 2700 Brønshøj / DK | 03 /
AAS, Flemming c/o Åkandevej 21 2700 Brønshøj / DK | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18836809.6 | 12.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018EP84526 | Priority number, date | DK2017PA00741 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: DK PA201700741 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019121220 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3729055 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/77, G01N21/85 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
G01N21/77 (EP,KR);
G01N21/85 (EP,KR);
G01N21/6428 (US);
G01N21/15 (KR);
G01N21/6408 (KR,US);
G01N33/49 (US);
G01N2021/157 (KR);
G01N2021/6432 (KR,US);
G01N2021/6439 (US);
G01N2021/7786 (EP,KR);
G01N2201/06113 (US);
G01N2201/062 (US);
G01N33/48 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | G01N21/15, G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SENSOR ZUM ERFASSEN DES VORHANDENSEINS ODER FEHLENS EINER VERUNREINIGUNG | [2024/30] | English: | METHOD AND SENSOR FOR DETECTING PRESENCE OR ABSENCE OF A CONTAMINANT | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DÉTECTEUR POUR DÉTECTER LA PRÉSENCE OU L'ABSENCE D'UN CONTAMINANT | [2024/30] |
Former [2020/44] | VERFAHREN UND SENSOR ZUR ERKENNUNG DER ANWESENHEIT ODER ABWESENHEIT EINER VERUNREINIGUNG | ||
Former [2020/44] | PROCÉDÉ ET CAPTEUR POUR DÉTECTER LA PRÉSENCE OU L'ABSENCE D'UN CONTAMINANT | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 02.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US5030420 (BACON JOHN R [US], et al); | [XI]US2003080002 (TAAGAARD MICHAEL [DK], et al); | [XI]JP2009281794 (UNIV OF SCIENCE TOKYO); | [A]US8354015 (KALTENBECK HEINZ [AT], et al) | by applicant | US5564419 | WO0104631 | EP2147307 | WO2017108646 | WO2017108647 |