EP3640609 - METHOD FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF SYSTEMIC LUPUS ERYTHEMATOSUS (SLE) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universitat Politècnica de València Edificio Nexus (6G) - Tercera Planta Camino de Vera, s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | For all designated states Instituto de Investigacion Sanitaria la Fe-Fundacion Para la Investigacion Del Hospital Universitario Y Politecnico la fe de l Comunidad Valenciana Avda. Fernando Abril Martorell 106 Hospital U. Y P. La Fe Torre A Pl 7 46026 Valencia / ES | For all designated states Universitat De València, Estudi General Avda. Blasco Ibáñez 13 46010 València / ES | [2023/43] |
Former [2023/30] | For all designated states Universitat Politècnica de València Edificio Nexus (6G) - Tercera Planta Camino de Vera, s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | ||
For all designated states Instituto De Investigación Sanitaria La Fe - Fundación Para La Investigatión Del Hospital Universitario Y Politécnico La Fe De La Avda. Fernando Abril Martorell 106 Hospital U. y P. La Fe, Torre Aplanta 7ª 46025 Valencia / ES | |||
For all designated states Universitat De València, Estudi General Avda. Blasco Ibáñez 13 46010 València / ES | |||
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states Universitat Politècnica de València Edificio Nexus (6G) - Tecera planta Camino de Vera, s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | ||
For all designated states Instituto De Investigación Sanitaria La Fe - Funda Avda. Fernando Abril Martorell 106 Hospital U. y P. La Fe, Torre Aplanta 7ª 46025 Valencia / ES | |||
For all designated states Universitat De València, Estudi General Avda. Blasco Ibáñez 13 46010 València / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARINE DO NASCIMENTO, Noelle c/o Universitat Politècnica de València Edificio Nexus (6G) - Tercera planta Camino de Vera s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | 02 /
GIMENEZ ROMERO, David c/o Universitat de València Estudi General Avda. Blasco Ibánez nº 13 46010 Valencia / ES | 03 /
MORAIS EZQUERRO, Sergi Beñat c/o Universitat Politècnica de València Edificio Nexus (6G) - Tercera planta Camino de Vera s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | 04 /
MAQUIEIRA CATALA, Angel c/o Universitat Politècnica de València Edificio Nexus (6G) - Tercera planta Camino de Vera s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | 05 /
JUSTE DOLZ, Augusto Miguel c/o Universitat Politècnica de València Edificio Nexus (6G) - Tercera planta Camino de Vera s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | 06 /
GRAU GARCIA, Elena c/o INSTITUTO DE INVESTIGACIÓN SANITARIA LA FE - FUNDACIÓN PARA LA Avda. Fernando Abril Martorell 106 Hospital U. y P. La Fe, Torre A, planta 7ª 46025 Valencia / ES | 07 /
PUCHADES PLA, Rosa c/o Universitat Politècnica de València Edificio Nexus (6G) - Tercera planta Camino de Vera s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | 08 /
ROMAN IBORRA, Jose Andres c/o INSTITUTO DE INVESTIGACIÓN SANITARIA LA FE - FUNDACIÓN PARA LA Avda. Fernando Abril Martorell 106 Hospital U. y P. La Fe, Torre A, planta 7ª 46025 Valencia / ES | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Clarke, Modet y Cía., S.L. C/ Suero de Quiñones 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 18838102.4 | 29.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018ES70467 | Priority number, date | ES20170030972 | 26.07.2017 Original published format: ES 201730972 | [2020/17] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019020847 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | ES | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640609 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 31.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01G3/13, G01N29/036, G01N33/53, G01G3/16 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
G01G3/16 (EP);
G01G3/13 (EP,ES);
G01N33/564 (US);
G01N29/036 (EP,ES);
G01N33/53 (EP,ES);
G01N33/54373 (US);
G01N2800/24 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/17] | G01G3/13, G01N29/036, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON SYSTEMISCHEN LUPUS ERYTHEMATOSUS (SLE) | [2020/17] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF SYSTEMIC LUPUS ERYTHEMATOSUS (SLE) | [2020/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC DE LUPUS ÉRYTHÉMATEUX DISSÉMINÉ (LED) | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2020 | Translation filed | 17.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 30.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/27] | 28.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID] - DO NASCIMENTO NOELLE M ET AL, "Label-free piezoelectric biosensor for prognosis and diagnosis of Systemic Lupus Erythematosus", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD. UK, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20161109), vol. 90, doi:10.1016/J.BIOS.2016.11.004, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 166 - 173, XP029862258 [ID] 1-4 * page 167, column 1, line 31 - line 66 * * page 167, column 2, line 22 - line 31 * * page 167, column 2, line 47 - page 168, column 1, line 36 * * page 168, column 1, line 55 - page 171, column 1, line 66 * * figures 2, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2016.11.004 | [A] - GEORGE A MCCUBBIN ET AL, "QCM-D fingerprinting of membrane-active peptides", EUROPEAN BIOPHYSICS JOURNAL ; WITH BIOPHYSICS LETTERS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20101216), vol. 40, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S00249-010-0652-5, ISSN 1432-1017, pages 437 - 446, XP019892758 [A] 1-4 * page 438, column 2, line 5 - page 440, column 1, line 21 * * page 441, column 1, line 13 - page 445, column 1, line 36 * * figures 1-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00249-010-0652-5 | International search | [A]WO9635103 (RODAHL MICHAEL [SE], et al) [A] 1-4* , todo el documento. *; | [A]WO2008114003 (INVERNESS MEDICAL SWITZERLAND [CH], et al) [A] 1-4 * , todo el documento. *; | [A] - DO NASCIMENTO NOELLE M et al., "Label-free piezoelectric biosensor for prognosis and diagnosis of Systemic Lupus Erythematosus", Biosensors and Bioelectronics, vol. 90, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 166 - 173, XP029862258 [A] 1-4 * , especialmente páginas 167-169; figura 2b. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2016.11.004 | [A] - DO NASCIMENTO NOELLE M. et al., "The Ro/SSA Complex in Systemic Lupus Erythematosus Patients", Tesis doctoral = [Thesis], doi:10.4995/Thesis/10251/80534, (20170200), pages 1 - 141, URL: https://riunet.upv.es/handle/10251/80534, (20180611), XP009518386 [A] 1-4 * , especialmente página 17. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4995/Thesis/10251/80534 | [A] - DIXON MATTHEW C., "Quartz crystal microbalance with dissipation monitoring: enabling real-time characterization of biological materials and their interactions", Journal of biomolecular techniques, (20080000), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 1943-4731, pages 151 - 158, XP055567060 [A] 1-4 * , todo el documento * | by applicant | US5501986 | WO2008114003 |