EP3658118 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING RESPIRATORY DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novavax, Inc. 700 Quince Orchard Road Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2024/42] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states Novavax, Inc. 21 Firstfield Road Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Gale c/o NOVAVAX Inc. 21 Firstfield Road Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | 02 /
LIU, Ye c/o NOVAVAX Inc. 21 Firstfield Road Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | 03 /
TIAN, Jing-Hui c/o NOVAVAX Inc. 21 Firstfield Road Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | 04 /
MASSARE, Michael c/o NOVAVAX Inc. 21 Firstfield Road Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | 05 /
BODDAPATI, Sarathi c/o NOVAVAX Inc. 21 Firstfield Road Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | 06 /
GLENN, Gregory c/o NOVAVAX Inc. 21 Firstfield Road Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | 07 /
FRIES, Louis c/o NOVAVAX Inc. 21 Firstfield Road Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | 08 /
CHO, Iksung c/o NOVAVAX Inc. 21 Firstfield Road Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Danner, Stefan Danner BioPharm IP Ludwigstraße 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/23] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18838914.2 | 24.07.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018US43431 | Priority number, date | US201762536235P | 24.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762536235 P | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019023196 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3658118 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/51, A61K31/047, A61K38/16, A61K39/12, A61K39/145, A61P31/14 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
A61K9/5115 (EP);
A61K9/5123 (US);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/155 (US);
A61P11/00 (US);
A61P31/14 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16022 (US);
C12N2760/16034 (US);
C12N2760/18522 (EP,US);
C12N2760/18534 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/23] | A61K9/14, A61K9/51, A61K31/047, A61K38/16, A61K39/12, A61K39/145 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ATEMWEGSERKRANKUNGEN | [2020/23] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING RESPIRATORY DISEASE | [2020/23] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR TRAITER LA MALADIE RESPIRATOIRE | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 21.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013011443 (FATTOM ALI I [US], et al); | [XY]WO2017102737 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOGICALS SA [BE]); | [Y]US2017202948 (SMITH GALE [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2009257980 (DAVIES DONNA ELIZABETH [GB], et al); | [A]US2013064867 (FATTOM ALI I [US], et al); | [A]US2015320854 (RADOSEVIC KATARINA [NL], et al); | [X]US2017202948 (SMITH GALE [US], et al); | by applicant | US4911928 | EP0436620 | US5057540 | EP0363279 | US5629021 | US6231859 | US6352697 | US6387373 | US6524584 | US6846489 | US7776343 | US2011305727 | US8173141 | US2013011443 | WO2017102737 | US2017202948 |