EP3659000 - FLEXIBLE COMPARTMENT DESIGN ON AUTONOMOUS AND SEMI-AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuro, Inc. 1300 Terra Bella Avenue 100 Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERGUSON, David 1300 Terra Bella Avenue 100 Mountain View California 94043 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Jiajun 1300 Terra Bella Avenue 100 Mountain View California 94043 / US | 03 /
JULIAN, Benjamin 1300 Terra Bella Avenue 100 Mountain View California 94043 / US | 04 /
RANSOHOFF, Nan 1300 Terra Bella Avenue 100 Mountain View California 94043 / US | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/23] | Kent, Miranda Jacket, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18839357.3 | 26.07.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018US43987 | Priority number, date | US201762538538P | 28.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762538538 P | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019023519 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3659000 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/36, B60R19/22, G05D21/00, G06Q10/06, G08G1/04, G08G1/00, G05D1/00, G06F3/01, G05D1/02, G06Q10/00, G06Q10/08, G06Q20/00, G06Q30/02, G06Q30/06, G06Q50/12, G06Q50/28, G06Q50/30, G07C9/00, A23L5/00, B60P3/00 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
G07C9/00896 (EP);
G09F21/048 (US);
A23L5/00 (EP,US);
B60P3/007 (EP,US);
B60R19/483 (US);
B60R21/34 (US);
B60W30/08 (US);
B60W60/001 (US);
B60W60/0017 (US);
B60W60/00256 (US);
B65G67/24 (US);
G01C21/20 (US);
G01C21/343 (US);
G01C21/3438 (US);
G01C21/3453 (US);
G05D1/0027 (EP,US);
G05D1/0033 (US);
G05D1/0038 (US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/0094 (US);
G05D1/0212 (US);
G05D1/0231 (US);
G05D1/0276 (US);
G05D1/0291 (US);
G05D1/0295 (EP);
G05D1/0297 (EP);
G05D1/12 (US);
G06F16/955 (US);
G06K19/06028 (US);
G06K19/0723 (US);
G06K7/10297 (US);
G06K7/1413 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06Q10/00 (EP);
G06Q10/0631 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06315 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0635 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/083 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0832 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0833 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0834 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0835 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08355 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0837 (EP,US);
G06Q20/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/127 (US);
G06Q20/18 (US);
G06Q30/0265 (US);
G06Q30/0266 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0631 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0645 (EP,US);
G06Q50/12 (EP,US);
G06Q50/40 (EP,US);
G06V20/64 (US);
G07C9/00563 (EP);
G07F17/0057 (US);
G07F17/12 (US);
G08G1/04 (EP,US);
G08G1/202 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (US);
H04W4/024 (US);
H04W4/40 (US);
A23L2/52 (US);
A23L7/109 (US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
A47J37/0658 (US);
A47J47/00 (US);
B60H1/00364 (US);
B60H1/00735 (US);
B60P1/36 (US);
B60P3/0257 (US);
B60R19/18 (US);
B60R2021/346 (US);
B60R21/36 (US);
B60R25/25 (US);
B60R25/252 (US);
B60W2420/403 (US);
B60W2420/408 (US);
B64U2101/64 (EP,US);
B64U2201/10 (EP);
B65G2209/06 (US);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06K7/10722 (US);
G06V20/56 (US);
G07C2009/0092 (EP);
G07C2209/63 (EP);
G07C9/00571 (EP);
G07C9/28 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/23] | G05D1/00, G05D3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER KAMMERENTWURF AUF EINEM AUTONOMEN UND HALBAUTONOMEN FAHRZEUG | [2020/23] | English: | FLEXIBLE COMPARTMENT DESIGN ON AUTONOMOUS AND SEMI-AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE | [2020/23] | French: | CONCEPTION DE COMPARTIMENT FLEXIBLE DANS UN VÉHICULE AUTONOME OU SEMI-AUTONOME | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 06.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7798886 (WILLIAMSON TASIA R [US]); | [A]EP2759990 (FRIESLAND BRANDS BV [NL]); | [A]US2014370167 (GARDEN ALEXANDER JOHN [US]); | [XI]US2015202770 (PATRON ANTHONY [US], et al); | [A]WO2017064202 (STARSHIP TECH OÜ [EE]); | [A]GB2544657 (OCADO INNOVATION LTD [GB]) | International search | [A]US2002023594 (GREENE GEORGE JEFFERSON [US]); | [A]US7798886 (WILLIAMSON TASIA R [US]); | [A]US2014136414 (ABHYANKER RAJ [US]); | [Y]US9256852 (MYLLYMAKI JUSSI [FI]); | [XY]US2016062583 (RICCI CHRISTOPHER P [US]) | by applicant | US2015202770 |