EP3711360 - METHODS AND APPARATUS TO REDUCE UE CAPABILITY INFORMATION MESSAGE SIZE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2022/23] |
Former [2020/39] | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALASUBRAMANIAN, Arun Prasanth 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
GHOLMIEH, Aziz 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GOEL, Neha 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
WANG, Shanshan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2022/23] |
Former [2020/39] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18839780.6 | 15.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018US61316 | Priority number, date | US201762586854P | 15.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762586854 P | US201816191179 | 14.11.2018 Original published format: US201816191179 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019099694 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3711360 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3711360 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/24, H04W24/02, H04W36/00, // H04L5/00, H04W60/00 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
H04W36/0022 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (US);
H04W8/24 (EP,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W60/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | H04W36/00, H04W60/00, H04W76/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER GRÖSSE EINER NACHRICHT ZUR INFORMATION ÜBER DIE KAPAZITÄT EINES BENUTZERGERÄTS | [2020/39] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS TO REDUCE UE CAPABILITY INFORMATION MESSAGE SIZE | [2020/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR RÉDUIRE LA TAILLE D'UN MESSAGE D'INFORMATIONS DE CAPACITÉ D'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 21.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2018 | AL | 08.06.2022 | AT | 08.06.2022 | CY | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | ES | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | IT | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | MK | 08.06.2022 | NL | 08.06.2022 | PL | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SE | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | IE | 15.11.2022 | LU | 15.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 15.11.2018 | |
AL | 08.06.2022 | ||
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CY | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
IT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
AT | 08.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 08.06.2022 | |
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2016242072 (HSU LIANGCHI [US], et al); | [A]WO2017119490 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]); | US2019020998 [ ] (TAKAHASHI HIDEAKI [JP], et al); |