EP3724652 - DEVICE, SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR IMAGING DEFECTS IN A STRUCTURE BY TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING MECHANICAL WAVES THROUGH THE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT À L'ÉNERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ÉNERGIES ALTERNATIVES 25, Rue Leblanc Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states SAFRAN 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESNIL, Olivier 4 place des Planches 91400 Orsay / FR | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Bonnet, Michel Cabinet Bonnet 93, rue Réaumur 75002 Paris / FR | [2020/43] | Application number, filing date | 18839830.9 | 13.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018FR53287 | Priority number, date | FR20170062166 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1762166 | [2020/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019115971 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724652 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04, G01N29/06, G01N29/24, G01N29/44 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
G01N29/0672 (EP);
G01N29/041 (US);
G01N29/043 (EP);
G01N29/0681 (US);
G01N29/069 (EP);
G01N29/2412 (EP,US);
G01N29/2418 (EP,US);
G01N29/2437 (EP,US);
G01N29/4436 (EP,US);
G01N29/4445 (EP);
G01N2291/0231 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0289 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BILDGEBUNG VON DEFEKTEN IN EINER STRUKTUR DURCH SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON MECHANISCHEN WELLEN DURCH DIE STRUKTUR | [2020/43] | English: | DEVICE, SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR IMAGING DEFECTS IN A STRUCTURE BY TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING MECHANICAL WAVES THROUGH THE STRUCTURE | [2020/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF, INSTALLATION ET PROCEDE D'IMAGERIE DE DEFAUTS D'UNE STRUCTURE PAR EMISSION ET RECEPTION D'ONDES MECANIQUES DANS CETTE STRUCTURE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 15.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR3014200 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]CN107037131 (UNIV CENTRAL SOUTH) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [YD] - XIAOLIANG ZHAO ET AL, "Active health monitoring of an aircraft wing with embedded piezoelectric sensor/actuator network: I. Defect detection, localization and growth monitoring", SMART MATERIALS AND STRUCTURES, IOP PUBLISHING LTD., BRISTOL, GB, (20070801), vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.1088/0964-1726/16/4/032, ISSN 0964-1726, pages 1208 - 1217, XP020120524 [YD] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0964-1726/16/4/032 | [Y] - SAKAI KAORU ET AL, "Defect detection method using statistical image processing of scanning acoustic tomography", 2016 IEEE 23RD INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON THE PHYSICAL AND FAILURE ANALYSIS OF INTEGRATED CIRCUITS (IPFA), IEEE, (20160718), doi:10.1109/IPFA.2016.7564303, pages 293 - 296, XP032958707 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPFA.2016.7564303 | [Y] - UNIV CENTRAL SOUTH, "Small defect ultrasonic detecting method based on extreme value distribution theory", EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, (20170504), Database accession no. CN-201710306311-A, XP002790679 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | - "Active health monitoring of an aircraft wing with embedded piezoelectric sensor/actuator network: I. Defect détection, localization and growth monitoring", ZHAO et al., Smart Materials and Structures, IOP Publishing, (20070000), vol. 16, pages 1208 - 1217 | - "Combination of nonlinear ultrasonics and guided wave tomography for imaging the micro-defects", LI et al., Ultrasonics, Elsevier, (20160000), vol. 65, pages 87 - 95 |