EP3729050 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IN-PROCESS PARTICLE SIZE DETERMINATION OF NANOSUSPENSIONS UNDER FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InProcess IP B.V. Kloosterstraat 9 5349 AB Oss / NL | [2023/29] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states Inprocess IP B.V. Kloosterstraat 9 5349 AB Oss / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESSELING, Rut Kloosterstraat 9 5349 AB Oss / NL | 02 /
GERICH, Ad Kloosterstraat 9 5349 AB Oss / NL | 03 /
DAMEN, Michiel Kloosterstraat 9 5349 AB Oss / NL | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2023/29] |
Former [2020/44] | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 18839947.1 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018NL50859 | Priority number, date | NL20172020138 | 20.12.2017 Original published format: NL 2020138 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019125155 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3729050 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3729050 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/02, G01N15/00 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
G01N15/0211 (EP,US);
G01N2015/0053 (EP);
G01N2015/0222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER PARTIKELGRÖSSE IN EINEM PROZESS VON NANOSUSPENSIONEN UNTER STRÖMUNG | [2020/44] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IN-PROCESS PARTICLE SIZE DETERMINATION OF NANOSUSPENSIONS UNDER FLOW | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTERMINATION DE TAILLE DE PARTICULE EN COURS DE FABRICATION DE NANOSUSPENSIONS SOUS ÉCOULEMENT | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 07.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | MC | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 19.07.2023 | |
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015369733 (IZUTANI YUSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0045] - [0068]; figures 1-9 *; | [A] - JONGHWAN LEE ET AL, "Dynamic light scattering optical coherence tomography", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20120913), vol. 20, no. 20, doi:10.1364/OE.20.022262, pages 22262 - 585, XP055321344 [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [03.1] , [03.2] , [03.4] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.20.022262 | [A] - LEUNG A B ET AL, "PARTICLE-SIZE AND VELOCITY MEASUREMENTS IN FLOWING CONDITIONS USING DYNAMIC LIGHT SCATTERING", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20060401), vol. 45, no. 10, doi:10.1364/AO.45.002186, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 2186 - 2190, XP001242305 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.45.002186 | by applicant | US5094532 | US5377005 | US5438408 | US5818583 | US6480276 | US6738144 | US6831741 | US7751053 | EP2270449 | US9341559 | - R CERBINO, Phys. Rev. Lett., (20080000), vol. 100, page 188102 | - PINE, D.J. et al., "Diffusing-wave spectroscopy: dynamic light scattering in the multiple scattering limit", Journal de Physique, (19900000), vol. 51, no. 18, pages 2101 - 2127 | - LCI DATA; I. POPOV; A. S. WEATHERBEE; I. A. VITKIN, "Dynamic light scattering arising from flowing Brownian particles: analytical model in optical coherence tomography conditions", J. Biomed. Opt., (20140000), vol. 19, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1117/1.JBO.19.12.127004, page 127004, XP060047186 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.JBO.19.12.127004 | - J. LEE; W. WU; J. Y. JIANG; B. ZHU; D. A. BOAS, "Dynamic light scattering optical coherence tomography", Optics Express, (20120000), vol. 20, no. 20, doi:doi:10.1364/OE.20.022262, page 22262, XP055321344 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.20.022262 |