EP3638367 - NANOSCALE METAL-ORGANIC LAYERS AND METAL-ORGANIC NANOPLATES FOR X-RAY INDUCED PHOTODYNAMIC THERAPY, RADIOTHERAPY, RADIODYNAMIC THERAPY, CHEMOTHERAPY, IMMUNOTHERAPY, AND ANY COMBINATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Chicago 6030 S. Ellis Edelstone 2S Chicago, IL 60637 / US | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Wenbin 120 E 56th St Chicago, IL 60637 / US | 02 /
NI, Kaiyuan The University of Chicago 6030 South Ellis Edelstone 2S Chicago, IL 60637 / US | 03 /
LAN, Guangxu The University of Chicago 6030 South Ellis Edelstone 2S Chicago, IL 60637 / US | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18840272.1 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018US45005 | Priority number, date | US201762540275P | 02.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762540275 P | US201862623826P | 30.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862623826 P | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019028250 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3638367 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/282, A61K41/00, A61K45/06, A61N5/06, A61N5/10, C07D213/26, C07D213/55, C07D487/22, A61P35/00 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
A61K41/0057 (EP,US);
A61K41/0071 (EP,US);
A61K31/282 (EP);
A61K33/243 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (US);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1098 (EP);
A61N5/062 (EP);
C07D213/26 (EP);
C07D213/55 (EP);
C07D487/22 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/282, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/17] | A61N5/06, A61K31/282, C07D487/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Extension states | BA | 16.01.2020 | ME | 16.01.2020 | Title | German: | NANOSKALIGE METALLORGANISCHE SCHICHTEN UND METALLORGANISCHE NANOPLATTEN FÜR DIE RÖNTGENSTRAHLINDUZIERTE PHOTODYNAMISCHE THERAPIE, STRAHLENTHERAPIE, DYNAMISCHE STRAHLENTHERAPIE, CHEMOTHERAPIE, IMMUNTHERAPIE UND EINE BELIEBIGE KOMBINATION DAVON | [2020/17] | English: | NANOSCALE METAL-ORGANIC LAYERS AND METAL-ORGANIC NANOPLATES FOR X-RAY INDUCED PHOTODYNAMIC THERAPY, RADIOTHERAPY, RADIODYNAMIC THERAPY, CHEMOTHERAPY, IMMUNOTHERAPY, AND ANY COMBINATION THEREOF | [2020/17] | French: | COUCHES ORGANOMÉTALLIQUES NANOMÉTRIQUES ET NANOPLAQUES ORGANOMÉTALLIQUES POUR THÉRAPIE PHOTODYNAMIQUE INDUITE PAR RAYONS X, RADIOTHÉRAPIE, THÉRAPIE RADIODYNAMIQUE, CHIMIOTHÉRAPIE, IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE, ET TOUTE COMBINAISON DE CELLES-CI | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 11.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO2016061256 (UNIV CHICAGO [US]) [X] 1-3 * entire document *; | [A]WO2017066328 (UNIV CHICAGO [US]) [A] 1-3, 17, 18, 23-25, 27, 28 * entire document *; | [A]US2017173572 (LIN WENBIN [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 17, 18, 23-25, 27, 28 * entire document *; | [A] - XU et al., "Nanoscale Metal-Organic Frameworks for Ratiometric Oxygen Sensing in Live Cells", J. Am. Chem. Soc., vol. 138, no. 7, (20160216), URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/abs/10.1021/jacs.5b13458, (20180917), XP055571115 [A] 1-3, 17, 18, 23-25, 27, 28 * , abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jacs.5b13458 | [XP] - LAN et al., "Nanoscale Metal-Organic Layers for Deeply Penetrating X-ray-Induced Photodynamic Therapy", Angew. Chem., (20170825), vol. 129, no. 40, pages 12270 - 12274, XP055571119 [XP] 1-3, 17, 18, 23-25, 27, 28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201704828 |