Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.03.2024 | Change - withdrawal | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
22.01.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
02.10.2020 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
02.10.2020 | Change - extension states | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] |
08.05.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
08.05.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
13.04.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.03.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.02.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.02.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.01.2020 | Change - representative | |
29.01.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.02.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.02.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication |