EP3664545 - RESOURCE ALLOCATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. No. 29 Xueyuan Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. No. 29, Xueyuan Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qinghua No. 29 Xueyuan Rd. Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 02 /
SU, Jinxi No. 29 Xueyuan Rd. Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Donghao No. 29 Xueyuan Rd. Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18840726.6 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018CN98387 | Priority number, date | CN201710662936 | 04.08.2017 Original published format: CN201710662936 | [2020/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019024901 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3664545 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, // H04W72/04 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,KR);
H04W72/23 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W72/04 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
H04W72/0466 (KR);
H04W72/0473 (US);
H04W72/30 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/24] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENZUWEISUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2020/24] | English: | RESOURCE ALLOCATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2020/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ATTRIBUTION DE RESSOURCE | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2020 | Translation filed | 26.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 21.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2016161408 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | International search | [A]CN1536904 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US2010329107 (YUK YOUNG SOO [KR], et al); | [A]US2012099557 (CHO HEE JEONG [KR], et al); | [A]CN102858012 (UNIV XIDIAN); | [A]US8767644 (WAGER STEFAN [FI], et al); | [A]CN105050189 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |