EP3664020 - IMAGE DATA GENERATION DEVICE, IMAGE RECOGNITION DEVICE, IMAGE DATA GENERATION PROGRAM, AND IMAGE RECOGNITION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN CORPORATION 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | For all designated states Kyushu Institute of Technology 1-1, Sensui-cho Tobata-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 804-8550 / JP | [2022/13] |
Former [2020/24] | For all designated states Equos Research Co., Ltd. Akihabara Daibiru 7F 18-13, Sotokanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kyushu Institute of Technology 1-1, Sensui-cho Tobata-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 804-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA Hideo c/o EQUOS RESEARCH CO. LTD. Akihabara Daibiru 7F 18-13 Sotokanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | 02 /
MURAMATSU Ryuya c/o EQUOS RESEARCH CO. LTD. Akihabara Daibiru 7F 18-13 Sotokanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | 03 /
SHIBATA Masatoshi c/o EQUOS RESEARCH CO. LTD. Akihabara Daibiru 7F 18-13 Sotokanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | 04 /
ENOKIDA Shuichi c/o KYUSHU INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 680-4 Kawazu Iizuka-shi Fukuoka 820-8502 / JP | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18841314.0 | 31.07.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018JP28606 | Priority number, date | JP20170148011 | 31.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017148011 | JP20180035744 | 28.02.2018 Original published format: JP 2018035744 | [2020/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019026890 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3664020 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/56 (US);
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
G06V40/103 (EP,US);
G06V40/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON BILDDATEN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDERKENNUNG, PROGRAMM ZUR BILDDATENERZEUGUNG UND BILDERZEUGUNGSPROGRAMM | [2020/24] | English: | IMAGE DATA GENERATION DEVICE, IMAGE RECOGNITION DEVICE, IMAGE DATA GENERATION PROGRAM, AND IMAGE RECOGNITION PROGRAM | [2020/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE D'IMAGE, PROGRAMME DE GÉNÉRATION DE DONNÉES D'IMAGE, ET PROGRAMME DE RECONNAISSANCE D'IMAGE | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2020 | Translation filed | 14.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 14.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009279738 (SASAKI MIKIO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0186]; figures 1-13 *; | [A]WO2014084218 (UNIV OSAKA [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0105]; figures 1-16 * | International search | [XA]JP2002123834 (OCEAN NETWORK CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-3, 10-11, 13- 15 * , abstract, paragraphs [0001]-[0008], [0032]-[0070], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) * [A] 4-9, 12; | [PA]JP2017187954 (KDDI CORP) [PA] 1-15 * , abstract (Family: none) * | [A] - HASHIMURA, KEISUKE, "Sign Language Recognition by Convolutional Neural Network with Concatenated Frame Image of Depth Image", IEICE technical report, (20161009), vol. 116, no. 248, ISSN 0913-5685, pages 17 - 22, XP009519049 [A] 1-15 | by applicant | - "3D Convolutional Neural Networks for Human Action Recognition", IEEE Transactions on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, (20130000), vol. 35, pages 221 - 231 | - "Scene Recognition by CNN using Frame Connected Images", MIRU2016 the 19th Meeting on Image Recognition and Understanding, pages PS1 - 27 |