EP3663075 - RESIN-METAL COMPOSITE, METHOD FOR PREPARING RESIN-METAL COMPOSITE, AND METHOD FOR DISMANTLING RESIN-METAL COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAGAWA, Hiroyuki c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
HOUJYOU, Fusao c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
ISHII, Toshiaki c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
KONDO, Takeshi c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 05 /
SUWA, Yuji c/o HITACHI, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18841432.0 | 20.03.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018JP11226 | Priority number, date | JP20170149424 | 01.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017149424 | [2020/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019026331 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3663075 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/02, B29C65/48, B29C65/64, B29C65/76, C08J5/12 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
B29C66/742 (EP);
B29C65/002 (EP);
B29C65/48 (EP);
B29C65/4835 (EP);
B29C65/64 (EP);
B29C65/76 (EP);
B29C66/026 (EP);
B29C66/45 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/721 (EP);
B29C66/7212 (EP);
B29C66/72141 (EP);
B29C66/7392 (EP);
B29C66/7394 (EP);
B29C66/7422 (EP);
B29C66/74283 (EP);
C08J5/121 (EP);
C09J5/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2063/00 (EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2277/10 (EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/08 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/24] | B29C65/02, B29C65/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | HARZ-METALL-VERBUND, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES HARZ-METALL-VERBUNDS UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZERLEGEN EINES HARZ-METALL-VERBUNDS | [2020/24] | English: | RESIN-METAL COMPOSITE, METHOD FOR PREPARING RESIN-METAL COMPOSITE, AND METHOD FOR DISMANTLING RESIN-METAL COMPOSITE | [2020/24] | French: | COMPOSITE RÉSINE-MÉTAL, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSITE RÉSINE-MÉTAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉMANTÈLEMENT D'UN COMPOSITE RÉSINE-MÉTAL | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2019 | Translation filed | 02.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 16.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2679330 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2a * * paragraph [0061] * [A] 6; | [X]WO2015069676 (COOPER TECHNOLOGIES CO [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0046] - [0047] *; | [X]JP2014208459 (MAZDA MOTOR) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 1,5,6 * * paragraphs [0049] , [0065] , [0097] *; | [XA]US2003024632 (HAHN JONG HOON [KR], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0034] * [A] 6; | [A]US2015247071 (CAILLIE CYRILLE [DE], et al) [A] 6 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0222] *; | [A]WO2017022003 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 6 * abstract * * figure 1 * | International search | [XY]JP2014503670 [X] 1-2, 5-6 * , * [Y] 3-4; | [XY]US2016284449 (HAQ MAHMOODUL [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-6 * , [0036]-[0065] * [Y] 4; | [XY]JP2002240190 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1, 3, 5-6 * , * [Y] 2-4; | [XY]JP2003118037 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1, 3, 5-6 * , * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]JP2017094708 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP) [Y] 2-4 * , * | by applicant | JP2014148113 | JPS5749354B | WO2016178345 | - Science, vol. 356, pages 62 - 65 |