EP3649482 - USE OF EXTENDED DETECTION PERIODS FOR RANGE ALIASING DETECTION AND MITIGATION IN A LIGHT DETECTION AND RANGING (LIDAR) SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waymo LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAND, Mark, Alexander Waymo LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Chettle, John Edward, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 18841748.9 | 06.06.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018US36227 | Priority number, date | US201715665591 | 01.08.2017 Original published format: US201715665591 | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019027567 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3649482 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3649482 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/491, G01S17/89, G05D1/02, G01S7/4865, G01S17/10, G01S17/42, G01S17/931, // G01S7/484 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
G01S7/4865 (EP,IL,US);
G01S7/4913 (IL,KR);
G01S7/491 (CN,IL);
G01S17/10 (EP,IL,US);
G01S17/42 (EP,IL,US);
G01S17/89 (CN,IL);
G01S17/931 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G01S7/484 (EP,IL);
G05D1/0214 (CN,IL);
G05D1/0257 (IL)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/20] | G01S7/491, G01S17/89, G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ERWEITERTEN DETEKTIONSZEITRÄUMEN ZUR DETEKTION UND VERRINGERUNG VON RANGE ALIASING IN EINEM LICHTDETEKTIONS- UND -ENTFERNUNGSMESSSYSTEM (LIDAR) | [2020/20] | English: | USE OF EXTENDED DETECTION PERIODS FOR RANGE ALIASING DETECTION AND MITIGATION IN A LIGHT DETECTION AND RANGING (LIDAR) SYSTEM | [2020/20] | French: | UTILISATION DE PÉRIODES DE DÉTECTION ÉTENDUES POUR LA DÉTECTION ET L'ATTÉNUATION D'UN REPLIEMENT DE PORTÉE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION ET DE LOCALISATION PAR LA LUMIÈRE (LIDAR) | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 11.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24156948.2 / EP4375703 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005162638 (SUZUKI YOUSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-11,14,15* paragraphs [0068] - [0070] - [0079] - [0085] - [0127] - [0133]; figures 1,9 * | International search | [A]US8368876 (JOHNSON MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See figures 7A-7B. *; | [A]US8629976 (HUI HUA [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See figures 2A-2B. *; | [A]US2015070683 (LEPERE GREGORY [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0056]-[0061], [0115]-[0116]; claim 1; and figures 1-3, 27. *; | [A]US9383447 (SCHMITT NIKOLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * See figures 4a-4b. *; | [A]US2016370460 (TAKAHASHI SHU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * See figures 2A, 3-4, 10. * | by applicant | US2005162638 | US2015070683 | US2019004177 |