EP3709802 - THE USE OF A MEDICAL GRADE HONEY BASED INGREDIENT FOR THE PREPARATION OF A COMPOSITION FOR PRESERVING HUMAN AND/OR ANIMAL TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Triticum Exploitatie B.V. Sleperweg 44 6222 NK Maastricht / NL | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POSTMES, Josephus Petrus Lidwinus c/o TRITICUM EXPLOITATIE B.V. Sleperweg 44 6222 NK Maastricht / NL | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18842470.9 | 15.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018NL50768 | Priority number, date | NL20172019918 | 15.11.2017 Original published format: NL 2019918 | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019098833 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709802 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
A01N1/021 (EP);
A01N1/0226 (US);
A61K35/644 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES BESTANDTEILS AUF BASIS VON HONIG IN MEDIZINISCHER QUALITÄT ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR KONSERVIERUNG VON MENSCHLICHEM UND/ODER TIERISCHEM GEWEBE | [2020/39] | English: | THE USE OF A MEDICAL GRADE HONEY BASED INGREDIENT FOR THE PREPARATION OF A COMPOSITION FOR PRESERVING HUMAN AND/OR ANIMAL TISSUE | [2020/39] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN INGRÉDIENT À BASE DE MIEL DE QUALITÉ MÉDICALE POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DESTINÉE À LA CONSERVATION DE TISSU HUMAIN ET/OU ANIMAL | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 12.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]SU1082362 ; | [X]SU1367931 ; | [XD]GB1253340 (INST PENTRU CONTROLUL DE STAT [RO]); | [X]DE2024341 ; | [X]CN1044575 (NO 204 HOSPITAL OF THE CHINESE [CN]); | [X]RU2123259 (KURSKIJ G MED UNI); | [AD]US2015030688 (SELL SCOTT ALLEN [US], et al); | by applicant | GB1253340 | RU95101881 | EP1239742 | WO2007137369 | US2015030688 |