EP3728310 - ANTIGEN BINDING POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIIV Healthcare UK (No.5) Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRYSTAL, Mark R. 36 E Industrial Road Branford, Connecticut 06405 / US | 02 /
WENSEL, David L. 36 E Industrial Road Branford, Connecticut 06405 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Drury, Elizabeth Anne GSK Legal & Compliance - Global Patents 79 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Drury, Elizabeth Anne GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 18842646.4 | 18.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018IB60271 | Priority number, date | US201762599902P | 18.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762599902 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019123262 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728310 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/10, C07K16/46, C07K16/28 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C07K16/1063 (EP,US);
C07K16/2812 (EP,US);
C07K16/468 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
C07K2317/14 (US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | ANTIGENBINDENDE POLYPEPTIDE | [2020/44] | English: | ANTIGEN BINDING POLYPEPTIDES | [2020/44] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DE LIAISON À UN ANTIGÈNE | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 22.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.01.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2016171980 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | by applicant | US3773919 | USRE30985E | US4560655 | US4657866 | US4767704 | US4927762 | US5122469 | WO9411026 | US5631144 | US5672502 | US6048728 | US6207446 | US6214553 | US6258558 | US6261804 | US6281344 | WO0204523 | US6518018 | US6818418 | US2005287153 | WO2006130834 | WO2009083804 | WO2009133208 | US7696320 | US2012121597 | WO2016000414 | US2016009789 | WO2016171980 | US9783703 |