EP3727277 - MULTI-PART DENTAL COMPOSITION HAVING STAGED VISCOSITY PRIOR TO HARDENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solventum Intellectual Properties Company 3M Center, 275-6E-21 2510 Conway Ave E Maplewood, MN 55144 / US | [2024/11] |
Former [2020/44] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBUSSEN, Gregory A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
ABUELYAMAN, Ahmed S. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
HOMNICK, Paul J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
CRAIG, Bradley D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
LIN, Ying 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
SAHOUANI, Hassan 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
CAO, Chuntao 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
MOSER, William H. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
WHITE, Kolby L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 10 /
RULE, Joseph D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 11 /
ZECH, Joachim ESPE Platz 82229 Seefeld / DE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18842732.2 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018IB60371 | Priority number, date | US201762607636P | 19.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762607636 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019123333 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3727277 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/08 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
A61K6/30 (EP,US);
A61K6/62 (US);
A61K6/76 (US);
A61K6/77 (US);
A61K6/887 (US);
C08K3/22 (US);
C08K3/40 (US);
C08K9/06 (US);
C08L33/10 (US);
C08L33/14 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/10 (EP);
A61K6/887, C08L33/10 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | MEHRTEILIGE DENTALZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ABGESTUFTER VISKOSITÄT VOR DEM AUSHÄRTEN | [2020/44] | English: | MULTI-PART DENTAL COMPOSITION HAVING STAGED VISCOSITY PRIOR TO HARDENING | [2020/44] | French: | COMPOSITION DENTAIRE À PLUSIEURS PARTIES AYANT UNE VISCOSITÉ À PLUSIEURS STADES AVANT DURCISSEMENT | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 09.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02058641 (KETTENBACH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-39 * claims 1-25 *; | [A] - KONURAY ALI OSMAN ET AL, "Sequential curing of amine-acrylate-methacrylate mixtures based on selective aza-Michael addition followed by radical photopolymerization", EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, GB, (20160920), vol. 84, doi:10.1016/J.EURPOLYMJ.2016.09.025, ISSN 0014-3057, pages 256 - 267, XP029832435 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eurpolymj.2016.09.025 | [A] - DEVATHA P. NAIR ET AL, "Two-Stage Reactive Polymer Network Forming Systems", ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS, (20120410), vol. 22, no. 7, doi:10.1002/adfm.201102742, ISSN 1616-301X, pages 1502 - 1510, XP055097405 [A] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.201102742 | by applicant | US4503169 | US4642126 | US4652274 | US4695251 | US5154762 | US5501727 | US5545676 | US5918772 | US5944419 | WO0130307 | US6572693 | US6624211 | US6730156 | WO2005016783 | US6899948 | US6982288 | WO2006020760 | US7173074 | WO2007104037 | US7429422 | WO2009061884 | US2009208909 | US7674850 | US7816423 | WO2010123800 | WO2017015193 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1565-94-2 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 128-37-0 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 96478-09-0 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 10373-78-1 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 75-09-2 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 58109-40-3 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 10287-53-3 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 26708-04-3 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. No. 162881-26-7 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 52628-03-2 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 27689-12-9 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 3290-92-4 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 109-16-0 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 109-99-9 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 33007-83-9 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 72869-86-4 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 24615-84-7 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 20882-04-6 | - "Testing of Dental Materials and Biomechanics", RONALS L.; SAKAGUCHI; JOHN M. POWERS, Craig's Restorative Dental Materials, Elsevier, (20120000), page 86 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1305-62-0 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 51978-15-5 | US20040122126 |