EP3666784 - MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR MODIFIED LIGNIN AND MODIFIED POLYPHENOL, AND MODIFIED LIGNIN-INCLUDING RESIN COMPOSITION MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marounouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TASHIRO, Hironori 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | 02 /
KOYAMA, Yoshihito 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18842933.6 | 10.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018JP30112 | Priority number, date | JP20170156186 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017156186 | [2020/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019031609 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666784 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07G1/00, C08H7/00, C08K5/07, C08K5/13, C08L97/00, C08L101/00 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
C07G1/00 (EP);
C08L97/005 (US);
C08K5/07 (EP);
C08K5/13 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP);
C08L97/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MODIFIZIERTEM LIGNIN UND MODIFIZIERTEM POLYPHENOL UND MODIFIZIERTES LIGNIN ENTHALTENDE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/25] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR MODIFIED LIGNIN AND MODIFIED POLYPHENOL, AND MODIFIED LIGNIN-INCLUDING RESIN COMPOSITION MATERIAL | [2020/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LIGNINE MODIFIÉE ET POLYPHÉNOL MODIFIÉ, ET MATÉRIAU DE COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE CONTENANT DE LA LIGNINE MODIFIÉE | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2020 | Translation filed | 31.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 28.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2009084320 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [A]JP2012082255 (HARIMA CHEMICALS INC, et al); | [X]JP2013199561 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND); | [X]WO2015147165 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO [JP]); | [A]JP2016540058 | by applicant | JP2014015579 | JP5671430B | WO2015147165 | WO2016104634 | JP2016540058 |