Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11394861 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2022 | B2 | US2020382686 | 03.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN96307 | 19.07.2018 | CN201720978352 | 07.08.2017 | CN201710666721 | 07.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102291793B | Global Dossier | 19.08.2021 | B1 | KR20200033327 | 27.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN96307 | 19.07.2018 | CN201720978352 | 07.08.2017 | CN201710666721 | 07.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6847300B | Global Dossier | 24.03.2021 | B2 | JP2020530136 | 15.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN96307 | 19.07.2018 | CN201720978352 | 07.08.2017 | CN201710666721 | 07.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4047920 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2024 | B1 | EP4047920 | 24.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN96307 | 19.07.2018 | CN201720978352 | 07.08.2017 | EP18843308 | 19.07.2018 | CN201710666721 | 07.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107277336B | Global Dossier | 24.03.2023 | B | CN107277336 | 20.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710666721 | 07.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3668078 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2022 | B1 | EP3668078 | 17.06.2020 | A4 | EP3668078 | 17.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN96307 | 19.07.2018 | CN201720978352 | 07.08.2017 | CN201710666721 | 07.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN207304699U | 01.05.2018 | U | Priority number | Date | CN201720978352 | 07.08.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019029332 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201720978352 | 07.08.2017 | CN201710666721 | 07.08.2017 | Type | Divisional application | EP4047920 |