EP3657780 - VIDEO CONFERENCE MULTIPOINT CONTROL METHOD, DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND COMPUTER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAN, Yunchuan ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Baudler, Ron Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 18843414.6 | 06.08.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018CN98995 | Priority number, date | CN201710682422 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: CN201710682422 | [2020/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019029485 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657780 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/15 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
H04N7/152 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/403 (CN);
H04L65/4046 (US);
H04L65/75 (CN);
H04L65/764 (US);
H04L67/1021 (EP);
H04L67/52 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Title | German: | MEHRPUNKT-STEUERVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND RECHNERVORRICHTUNG FÜR VIDEOKONFERENZ | [2020/22] | English: | VIDEO CONFERENCE MULTIPOINT CONTROL METHOD, DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND COMPUTER DEVICE | [2020/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE MULTIPOINT DE VIDÉOCONFÉRENCE, DISPOSITIF, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE, ET DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2020 | Translation filed | 17.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 23.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000041229 (NIPPON ELECTRIC ENG)[A] 1-12; | [A]CN101316351 (SHENZHEN HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN101883105 (HANGZHOU H3C TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12; | [X]CN106534759 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-12 |