EP3636831 - COATING COMPOSITION FOR LOW IGNITION PROPENSITY CIGARETTE PAPER, TOBACCO USING SAME, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LOW IGNITION PROPENSITY CIGARETTE PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KT & G Corporation 71 Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Young Sin 71 Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Moon-Yong 71 Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Han-Jae 71 Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | 04 /
CHO, Sung Eel 71 Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | 05 /
GWAK, Hyo-Min 71 Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Dong Hun 71 Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Seok Jae 71 Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | 08 /
LEE, Heung Jae 71 Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18843475.7 | 07.08.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018KR08977 | Priority number, date | KR20170101890 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170101890 | [2020/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019031823 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636831 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3636831 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/14, A24D1/00, A24D1/02, A24D1/04, D21H17/06, D21H17/24, D21H17/31, D21H27/00 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
D21H17/31 (EP,US);
D21H19/14 (EP,KR,RU);
A24C5/005 (US);
A24D1/00 (EP,KR,US);
A24D1/002 (KR,RU);
A24D1/02 (EP,KR);
A24D1/025 (RU,US);
A24D1/04 (EP);
A24D1/045 (KR,RU);
D21H17/06 (EP);
D21H17/24 (EP);
D21H19/34 (US);
D21H27/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | D21H19/14, A24D1/00, A24D1/02, A24D1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR ZIGARETTENPAPIER MIT GERINGER ZÜNDUNGSTENDENZ, TABAK MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZIGARETTENPAPIER MIT GERINGER ZÜNDUNGSTENDENZ | [2020/16] | English: | COATING COMPOSITION FOR LOW IGNITION PROPENSITY CIGARETTE PAPER, TOBACCO USING SAME, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LOW IGNITION PROPENSITY CIGARETTE PAPER | [2020/16] | French: | COMPOSITION DE COUCHAGE POUR PAPIER À CIGARETTE À FAIBLE PROPENSION À L'INFLAMMATION, TABAC L'UTILISANT, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER À CIGARETTE À FAIBLE PROPENSION À L'INFLAMMATION | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2019 | Translation filed | 09.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 05.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2021 | Observations by third parties | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2021 | Observations by third parties | 06.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.2023
07.05.2024
WITHDRAWN Miquel y Costas & Miquel S.A. C/ Tuset 8-10 08008 Barcelona / ES Opponent's representative Cueto, Sénida SP3 Patents S.L. Los Madroños, 23 28891 Velilla de San Antonio / ES | [2024/24] |
Former [2023/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.2023
02.08.2023
ADMISSIBLE Miquel y Costas & Miquel S.A. C/ Tuset 8-10 08008 Barcelona / ES Opponent's representative Cueto, Sénida SP3 Patents S.L. Los Madroños, 23 28891 Velilla de San Antonio / ES | 17.08.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.12.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 16.05.2024 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2024/38] | 13.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | IT | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | IE | 07.08.2023 | LU | 07.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
IT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
IE | 07.08.2023 | ||
LU | 07.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
IT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 07.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 07.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 02.11.2022 | |
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 02.11.2022 | |
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 02.11.2022 | |
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 02.11.2022 | |
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 02.11.2022 | |
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03061410 (SCHWEITZER MAUDUIT INT INC [US]) [A] 1-11* claim 1 *; | [A]EP2719293 (MIQUEL Y COSTAS & MIQUEL SA [ES]) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [I]WO2015141919 (KT & G CORP [KR]) [I] 1-11 * claims 1-16 * * paragraphs [0054] , [0057] , [0058] * | International search | [Y]US4044778 (COHN CHARLES C) [Y] 1-12 * See claims 1-10; figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US4453553 (COHN CHARLES C [US]) [Y] 1-12 * See claims 4, 6, 8; examples 80, 93. *; | [A]KR20140084035 (MIQUEL Y COSTAS & MIQUEL SA [ES]) [A] 1-12 * See abstract; claims 1-2. *; | [A]KR101534822B (KT & G CORP [KR]) [A] 1-12* See abstract; claims 1-7, 10-11; figures 2-3. *; | [Y]CN104805730 (MUDANJIANG HENGFENG PAPER CO LTD) [Y] 1-12 * See abstract; claims 1-2, 6-10; figure 1. *; | [Y]KR101582900B (MUDANJIANG HENGFENG PAPER CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-12 * See claims 1, 5, 7, 9; paragraphs [0013], [00161, [0024], [0028], [0040]; figures 1, 2. * | by applicant | KR20130045157 | other | US4044778 | US4453553 | WO8504080 | EP1417899 | EP2679722 | EP2719293 | EP2725138 | CN104805730 | - Anonymous, "Tech Tip 17 Measuring Ink Viscosity", MacDermid Printing Solutions, (20150000), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://printing.macdermid.com/files/5014/2651/9078/Tech_Tip_17.pdf, XP055787116 | - Teuvo Leppanen, "Rotogravure printing BJA60A1300 Usage and properties of paper", UPM, (2011), pages 1 - 45, XP055787117 | Opposition | US4044778 | US4453553 | EP1417899 | EP2679722 | EP2719293 | CN104805730 | - J. Davidsohn, "Chapter XX: Technical Soaps", Soap Manufacture in Two Volumes, Interscience Publishers, (19530101), pages 427 - 437, doi:10.1533/9780857095787.4.369, XP009550319 | - Meer William, "Gum Arabic", Meer William, Robert L Davidson, Handbook of Water-Soluble Gums and Resins, McGraw Hill Book Company, (19800101), pages 8 - 8-5, ISBN 978-0-07-015471-1, XP093099860 | - Juhász Réka, Salgó András, "Pasting Behavior of Amylose, Amylopectin and Their Mixtures as Determined by RVA Curves and First Derivatives", Starch/Starke, DE , (20080201), vol. 60, no. 2, doi:10.1002/star.200700634, ISSN 0038-9056, pages 70 - 78, XP093099867 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/star.200700634 | - Cao Chuan, Wei Dongmei, Xuan Fengqin, Deng Changyue, Hu Jingwei, Zhou Yibin, "Comparative study on the structure and physicochemical of waxy rice starch by phosphorylation, lactylation and dual-modified", Food Science and Technology, BR , (20220101), vol. 42, doi:10.1590/fst.18622, ISSN 0101-2061, pages 1 - 10, XP093099869 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1590/fst.18622 | - Mazurkiewiez Jozef, Maria Nowotny-Ruzanska, "Viscosity of Aqueous solutions saccharides ", Polish Journal of food and nutrition science, (19980101), vol. 7, pages 171 - 179, XP093099881 | - Dalbey Steven J, "Printing Aqueous Inks on Nonwovens", Polytex, (20050101), pages 1 - 11, XP093099890 | - Anonymous, "Leading Innovation web-fed performance programme", Bobst, (20160101), pages 1 - 8, XP093101234 | - Poorolajal Jalal, Assari Mohammad Javad, Mohammadi Younes, Gohari-Ensaf Fatemeh, "Impact of cigarettes’ filter length and diameter on cigarette smoke emissions", Clinical Epidemiology and Global Health, (20200601), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.cegh.2019.09.006, ISSN 2213-3984, pages 377 - 382, XP093100522 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cegh.2019.09.006 | - Lazarus George, "New slim cigarette enters crowded field ", (19870723), pages 1 - 1, Chicagotribune, URL: https://www.chicagotribune.com/news/ct-xpm-1987-07-23-8702230973-story.html, (20231113), XP093100523 | - Anonymous, "Printing Presses", Anonymous, Victor Strauss, The printing industry, Printing industries of America Inc, (19670101), pages 292 - 293, XP093100526 | - Teuvo Leppanen, "Rotogravure printing BJA60A1300 Usage and properties of paper", UPM, (20110101), pages 1 - 45, XP055787117 | - Datt Prem, "Latent Heat of Vaporization/Condensation", Datt Prem, Vijay P. Singh, Pratap Singh, Umesh K. Haritashya, Encyclopedia of Snow, Ice and Glaciers, Springer Dordrecht, (20110101), pages 703 - 703, doi:10.1007/978-90-481-2642-2, ISBN 978-90-48-12641-5, XP093100527 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-90-481-2642-2 | - Williams P A, G. O. Phillips, "Gum arabic", Williams P A, G. O. Phillips, G. O. Phillips and P. A. Williams, Handbook of hydrocolloids Second edition , Woodhead publishing Limited , (20090528), pages 252 - 273, XP093100530 | - Proctor Robert N, "The history of the discovery of the cigarette-lung cancer link: evidentiary traditions, corporate denial, global toll", Tabacco control, GB , (20120301), vol. 21, no. 2, doi:10.1136/tobaccocontrol-2011-050338, ISSN 0964-4563, pages 87 - 91, XP093100534 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/tobaccocontrol-2011-050338 | - Anonymous, "Molins Mark 8 Cigarette Machine undergoing Full Rebuild", (20230725), pages 1 - 2, Makepakinternational, URL: http://makepakinternational.com/shop/cigarette-machinery/fully-re-built-equipment/molins-mk9-max-s-copy/, (20231113), XP093100540 |