EP3625596 - OPTICAL MEMBER, POLARIZATION MEMBER, AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANDA, Tomomichi 2-7sSugasawa-cho Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
YOKOTE, Yoshihiro 2-7 Sugasawa-cho Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
KONUMA, Osamu 2-7 Sugasawa-cho Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
SASAKI, Katsutoshi 2-7 Sugasawa-cho Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18843554.9 | 06.08.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018KR08892 | Priority number, date | JP20170153402 | 08.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017153402 | KR20180051464 | 03.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180051464 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019031786 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3625596 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/18, G02B1/11, G02B5/30, C08L1/12, C08L101/04, C08K3/36, C08K7/24 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
G02B5/3025 (EP);
G02B5/1823 (KR);
C08K3/36 (KR);
C08K7/24 (KR);
C08L1/12 (KR);
C08L101/04 (KR);
G02B1/11 (KR);
G02B5/1814 (EP);
G02B5/1871 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES ELEMENT, POLARISATIONSELEMENT UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/13] | English: | OPTICAL MEMBER, POLARIZATION MEMBER, AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2020/13] | French: | ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE, ÉLÉMENT DE POLARISATION ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 19.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013057955 (KODAMA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [XYI]US2013170041 (OKADA YUKA [JP], et al); | [A]EP2749912 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [I]US2016187699 (JU YOUNG HYUN [KR], et al) | International search | [A]US2006113901 (OH JONG-SEOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0031]-[0034], claim 1 and figure 3. *; | [A]WO2017001424 (DEMAX - HOLOGRAMS AD [BG]) [A] 1-15 * See pages 6-7, claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2009272059 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-6 and figures 1-13. *; | [A]US2006006778 (LEE JOON-GU [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-8 and figures 3-4. *; | [A]US2005077820 (ONISHI YASUHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-8 and figures 1-2. * | by applicant | US2013170041 | US2013057955 | US2016187699 |