EP3665002 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FORMING PACKAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, LLC Law department - 9th floor 1500 Riveredge Parkway, Suite 100 Atlanta, Georgia 30328 / US | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALSH, Joseph, C. 5532 La Plata Circle Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 02 /
CONATSER, Robert, Lee 6769 Abundance Way Golden, CO 80403 / US | 03 /
LUPFER, Nicholas, P. 2365 S. Hoyt Street Lakewood, CO 80227 / US | 04 /
COX, William, Allen 2387 Hidden Lake Court West Bloomfield, MI 48324 / US | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18843926.9 | 06.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018US45338 | Priority number, date | US201762542863P | 09.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762542863 P | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019032436 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3665002 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/00, B31B50/06, B31B50/10, B31B50/14, B31B50/26, B31B50/62, B31B50/81, B65D5/60, // B31B120/30, B31B155/00, B31B160/20, B31B170/10, B31B170/20, B31B120/40, B31B105/00, B31B110/10 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
B65D5/606 (EP,US);
B31B50/06 (EP,US);
B31B50/102 (EP,US);
B31B50/14 (EP,US);
B31B50/26 (EP,US);
B31B50/624 (EP,US);
B31B50/64 (US);
B31B50/72 (US);
B31B50/811 (EP,US);
B65D33/02 (US);
B65D65/14 (US);
B31B2105/0022 (EP,US);
B31B2110/10 (EP,US);
B31B2120/30 (EP,US);
B31B2120/302 (EP);
B31B2120/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | B31B70/04, B31B70/10, B31B70/26, B31B70/62, B65H20/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PACKUNGEN | [2020/25] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FORMING PACKAGES | [2020/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE FORMATION D'EMBALLAGES | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 08.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3878771 (MALCOLM JAMES A); | [XAI]US5097651 (DECOTTIGNIES LAURENT [FR], et al); | [A]US5224919 (WALSH JOSEPH C [US]); | [XAI]US2003197051 (MUISE HERBERT D [US], et al); | [XAI]US2017015079 (WALSH JOSEPH C [US]) | International search | [A]US3878771 (MALCOLM JAMES A) [A] 1-57 * See claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]US4359214 (ELDRIDGE CHARLES W) [A] 1-57* See claim 1 figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US5097651 (DECOTTIGNIES LAURENT [FR], et al) [Y] 14, 15, 28-33, 36, 37 ,40, 41, 43-47, 50 ,53-57 * See column 2, lines 20-32, claims 1, 7, and figure 1a. *; | [XYA]US5224919 (WALSH JOSEPH C [US]) [X] 1-6, 10, 16, 18-21, 24 * See column 6, lines 50-65, column 7, lines 15-47, column 8, lines 5-19, column 9, lines 3-7, 48-65, column 10, lines 17-39, column 17, lines 54 - column 18, line 50 and figures 4-6, 19, 21. * [Y] 14, 15, 28-33, 36, 37 ,40, 41, 43-47, 50 ,53- 57 [A] 7-9, 11-13, 17, 22, 23 ,25-27, 34, 35, 38, 39 ,42, 48, 49, 51, 52; | [A]US2016318274 (WALSH JOSEPH C [US]) [A] 1-57 * See paragraphs [0031]-[0033] and figures 5-8. * |