EP3664940 - OPTICALLY TRANSPARENT MICROMACHINED ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER (CMUT) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states North Carolina State University 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, NC 27606 / US | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORALKAN, Omer North Carolina State University 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, NC 27606 / US | 02 /
YAMANER, Feysel Yalcin North Carolina State University 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, NC 27606 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Xiao North Carolina State University 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, NC 27606 / US | [2022/02] |
Former [2020/25] | 01 /
ORALKAN, Omer North Carolina State University 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | ||
02 /
YAMANER, Feysel Yalcin North Carolina State University 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Xiao North Carolina State University 1021 Main Campus Drive 2nd Floor Raleigh, North Carolina 27606 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18844098.6 | 10.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018US46170 | Priority number, date | US201762544451P | 11.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762544451 P | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019032938 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3664940 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/02, B06B1/04, B06B1/18, G01N29/24 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
G01N29/2406 (EP,US);
B06B1/0292 (EP,US);
B06B1/0215 (US);
B81B3/0083 (US);
B81C1/00714 (US);
B81C3/001 (US);
B81B2201/0271 (US);
B81B2203/0315 (US);
B81B2203/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | OPTISCH TRANSPARENTER MIKROBEARBEITETER ULTRASCHALLWANDLER (CMUT) | [2020/25] | English: | OPTICALLY TRANSPARENT MICROMACHINED ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER (CMUT) | [2020/25] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR À ULTRASONS MICRO-USINÉ (CMUT) OPTIQUEMENT TRANSPARENT | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 17.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/33] | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005177045 (DEGERTEKIN F L [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0038] *; | [Y]WO2005087391 (GEORGIA TECH RES INST [US], et al) [Y] 3 * page 19, line 21 - line 23 *; | [Y]US2011227448 (KANDORI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0041] *; | [Y]US2016051225 (KIM DONGKYUN [KR], et al) [Y] 6* figure 6 *; | [XY] - DA-CHEN PANG ET AL, "Development of a Novel Transparent Flexible Capacitive Micromachined Ultrasonic Transducer", SENSORS, (20170101), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:10.3390/s17061443, page 1443, XP055620130 [X] 1,5,7-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * figures 3,4,5,8 * * table 1 * [Y] 2-4,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s17061443 | International search | [A]US2005200241 (DEGERTEKIN F L [US]) [A] 1-7 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2007230721 (WHITE ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * ; entire document *; | [Y]US2008087105 (RENKEN WAYNE G [US], et al) [Y] 3, 4/3, 5/4/3, 6/5/4/3, & 7/4/3 * ; abstract; figure 6A; paragraph [0056 & 0058] *; | [A]US2011068654 (CHENG CHING-HSIANG [HK], et al) [A] 1-7 * ; entire document *; | [A]WO2017115010 (TEKNOLOGIAN TUTKIMUSKESKUS VTT OY [FI]) [A] 1-7 * ; entire document *; | [PX]US2017232474 (ORALKAN OMER [US], et al) [PX] 1-7* ; entire document *; | [XY] - ZHANG, X et al., "CMUTs on Glass with ITO Bottom Electrodes for Improved Transparency", IEEE International Ultrasonics Symposium, (20161103), pages 1 - 4, URL: https://research.ece.ncsu.edu/imist/wp-content/uptoads/ 2016/11/02 _Zhang_16.pdf, (20180925), XP032988553 [X] 1-2, 4/1-4/2, 5/4/1-5/4/2 & 6/5/4/1-6/5/4/2 * ; entire document. * [Y] 3, 4/3, 5/4/3, 6/5/4/3, & 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.2016.7728671 | [Y] - Anonymous, "Corning Willow Glass", (20170123), Fact Sheet, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20170123132604/http://www.corning.com/media/worldwide/cdt/documents/Willow_2014_fact_sheet.pdf, (20180925), XP009519318 [Y] 7 * ; entire document. * | by applicant | US2005177045 | US2005200241 | WO2005087391 | US2007230721 | US2008087105 | US2011068654 | US2011227448 | US2016051225 | WO2017115010 | US2017232474 | - DA-CHEN PANG et al., "Development of a Novel Transparent Flexible Capacitive Micromachined Ultrasonic Transducer", SENSORS, (20170101), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:10.3390/s17061443, page 1443, XP055620130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s17061443 | - ZHANG et al., "CMUTs on Glass with ITO Bottom Electrodes for Improved Transparency", IEEE International Ultrasonic Symposium, (20161103), pages 1 - 4 |