EP3665965 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION IN NEW RADIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 5G IP Holdings LLC 8140 Walnut Hill Ln 500 Dallas, TX 75231 / US | [2021/51] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states FG Innovation Company Limited Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road Tuen Mun New Territories Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Chiahung FACA 5F-1 No. 5 Hsin-An Rd. Hsinchu Science-Based Industrial Park Hsinchu 300 / TW | 02 /
CHOU, Chieming FACA 5F-1 No. 5 Hsin-An Rd. Hsinchu Science-Based Industrial Park Hsinchu 300 / TW | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18844766.8 | 10.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018CN99893 | Priority number, date | US201762544181P | 11.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762544181 P | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019029682 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3665965 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W76/28 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
H04W52/0225 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/0209 (EP);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W52/0235 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (KR,US);
H04W72/23 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR DISKONTINUIERLICHEN EMPFANG IN NEW RADIO | [2020/25] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR DISCONTINUOUS RECEPTION IN NEW RADIO | [2020/25] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉCEPTION DISCONTINUE DANS UNE NOUVELLE RADIO | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 29.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015181526 (LEE SUNYOUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0136] * * figures 1, 9 *; | [A]WO2016140274 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0124] *; | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "Power saving for wideband NR carrier", vol. RAN WG2, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170629, (20170616), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1706423 POWER SAVING FOR WIDEBAND NR CARRIER, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_AHs/2017_06_NR/Docs/, (20170616), XP051306448 [Y] 1-9 * paragraph 2 * | [A] - GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOM, "Bandwidth part configuration and frequency resource allocation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, P.R. China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1710164, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170626), XP051299388 [A] 2,5,8 * paragraph 2 * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "Consideration for DRX in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170629, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1706750_CONSIDERATION FOR DRX IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170626), XP051301249 [A] 1-9 * paragraph 2.2 * * paragraph 2.3 * | [A] - OPPO, "DRX enhancement in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170629, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1706354-DRX ENHANCEMENT IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170626), XP051300868 [A] 1-9 * paragraph 2 * | International search | [A]CN101562889 (DATANG TELECOM TECHNOLOGY CO L [CN]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102118768 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [X]CN102932881 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-29 * description, paragraphs 23-61 *; | [A]CN102932882 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016150494 (TABET TARIK [US], et al) [A] 1-29* the whole document * | by applicant | US2015181526 |