EP3667232 - LAND FEATURE DATA STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 28-8 Honkomagome 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0021 / JP | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMANO, Katsumi c/o Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Plant 25-1 Yamada Kawagoe-shi Saitama 350-8555 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Reiji c/o Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Plant 25-1 Yamada Kawagoe-shi Saitama 350-8555 / JP | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18844780.9 | 02.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018JP28974 | Priority number, date | JP20170154122 | 09.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017154122 | [2020/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019031373 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667232 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01C7/04, G01C15/00, G01S17/89, G01C21/00 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
G01C21/3815 (EP);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01C21/3848 (EP);
G01C21/387 (EP);
G01C7/04 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | G01C7/04, G01C15/00, G01S17/89 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Title | German: | DATENSTRUKTUR EINES LANDMERKMALS | [2020/25] | English: | LAND FEATURE DATA STRUCTURE | [2020/25] | French: | STRUCTURE DE DONNÉES DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE TERRAIN | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2020 | Translation filed | 04.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 08.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2808699 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] ** paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063] *; | [A]US2014379254 (MIKSA KRZYSZTOF [PL], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0104] * * figures 1-6 *; | [XI]DE102014220687 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0086] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 6-9; | [A]WO2017070127 (GOOGLE INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [00116] - paragraph [00117] * * figures 1-2 *; | [P]US2017236419 (GREWE RALPH [DE]) | International search | [A]JPS60209191 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [X]JPH10311730 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0025], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2014173956 (AISIN AW CO) [X] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0087], fig. 1-15 (Family: none) *; | [A]US2015260530 (STENBORG ERIK [SE], et al) [A] 1-10* , entire text, all drawings & EP 2918974 A1 & CN 104977012 A *; | [A]JP2016068654 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2011196916 |