EP3664648 - SURGICAL DRAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROCEPT BioRobotics Corporation 900 Island Drive, Suite 210 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2022/16] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states Procept Biorobotics Corporation 900 Island Drive, Suite 210 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANTRI, Surag 1944 Tate Street East Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
ALJURI, Nikolai 1212 Southdown Road Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | 03 /
SPRINKEL, Matt 523 Hillside Road Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | 04 /
BADIA, James 2785 Washington Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 05 /
WANCHOO, Nishey 1115 W Hillsdale Boulevard San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 06 /
BAERENRODT, Mark 8 Cypress Court Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | 07 /
STAID, Kevin 830 Main St. Apt 305 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/12] | 01 /
MANTRI, Surag 1944 Tate Street East Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | ||
02 /
ALJURI, Nikolai 1212 Southdown Road Hillsborough CA 94010 / US | |||
03 /
SPRINKEL, Matt 523 Hillside Road Redwood City CA 94062 / US | |||
04 /
BADIA, James 2785 Washington Avenue Redwood City CA 94061 / US | |||
05 /
WANCHOO, Nishey 1115 W Hillsdale Boulevard San Mateo CA 94403 / US | |||
06 /
BAERENRODT, Mark 8 Cypress Court Millbrae CA 94030 / US | |||
07 /
STAID, Kevin 830 Main St. Apt 305 Redwood City CA 94063 / US | |||
Former [2020/25] | 01 /
MANTRI, Surag 587 Leyte Terrace Sunnyvale CA 94089 / US | ||
02 /
ALJURI, Nikolai 1212 Southdown Road Hillsborough CA 94010 / US | |||
03 /
SPRINKEL, Matt 523 Hillside Road Redwood City CA 94062 / US | |||
04 /
BADIA, James 2785 Washington Avenue Redwood City CA 94061 / US | |||
05 /
WANCHOO, Nishey 1115 W Hillsdale Boulevard San Mateo CA 94403 / US | |||
06 /
BAERENRODT, Mark 8 Cypress Court Millbrae CA 94030 / US | |||
07 /
STAID, Kevin 830 Main St. Apt 305 Redwood City CA 94063 / US | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/17] |
Former [2020/25] | Clark, Jane Anne Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18844837.7 | 10.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018US46254 | Priority number, date | US201762543893P | 10.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762543893 P | US201862671320P | 14.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862671320 P | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019032986 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3664648 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3664648 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A41B9/00, A41D10/00, A61F3/00, A61F5/37, A61F13/00, A61F13/15, A61F13/20, A61B46/00, A61B46/10 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61B46/20 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/31 (CN,US);
A61B46/30 (EP,CN,US);
A61B34/74 (CN,US);
A61B46/10 (CN,US);
A61B46/40 (CN,US);
A61B8/12 (CN,US);
A61F5/37 (EP,CN);
A61B2046/205 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | A41B9/00, A41D10/00, A61F3/00, A61F5/37, A61F13/00, A61F13/15, A61F13/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES TUCH | [2020/25] | English: | SURGICAL DRAPE | [2020/25] | French: | CHAMP OPÉRATOIRE | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 25.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23161918.0 / EP4218469 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IE | 10.08.2023 | LU | 10.08.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IE | 10.08.2023 | ||
LU | 10.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
LU | 10.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
LU | 10.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | NL | 26.04.2023 | |
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5445165 (FENWICK ROBERT C [US]) [Y] 3,5,6,14,15 * figures 1-4 * * column 4, lines 10-44 *; | [XYI]US2007102005 (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10,11,15 * figure 14 * * paragraphs [0073] , [0 76] , [0 80] * [Y] 3,5,6,14,15 [I] 7,9,12,13; | [Y]US2016213439 (MUNSON ERIK A [US]) [Y] 3,5,6,14,15 * figures 3, 4 ** paragraphs [0027] - [0030] * | International search | [A]US3251360 (MELGES FREDERICK J) [A] 1-145 * entire document *; | [A]US5305765 (POTTS WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 1-145* entire document *; | [A]US5388593 (THOMALLA JAMES V [US]) [A] 1-145 * entire document *; | [Y]US6357445 (SHAW TIMOTHY A [US]) [Y] 6 * entire document *; | [XY]US8739797 (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [X] 1, 5, 11, 14-24, 26, 29, 30, 48-54, 57, 61, 77-81, 83-89, 142-144 * entire document * [Y] 6 | by applicant | US445165 | US2007102005 | WO2013130895 | US2016213439 | WO2017161331 | WO2013US28441 | WO2017US23062 |